This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 10/08/2020 at 15:40:37 (UTC).

WATERSIDE CHIROPRACTIC, INC. A/A/O CRAIG DEPASS VS PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 WATERSIDE CHIROPRACTIC, INC A/A/O CRAIG DEPASS filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MORAN, JOHN A.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MORAN, JOHN A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WATERSIDE CHIROPRACTIC, INC. A/A/O CRAIG DEPASS

8551 W. Sunrise Blvd. Suite 203

Plantation, FL 33322

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

600 North Westshore Blvd., Suite #500

Tampa, FL 33609

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Greene, Travis

300 Se 17Th St

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33316-2550

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

9/24/2020- D6- SUMMONS ISSUED PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY - PLAINTIFF

9/24/2020- D3- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY - PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

9/24/2020- D2- COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

COVER SHEET CIVIL - PLAINTIFF

9/24/2020- D1- COVER SHEET CIVIL - PLAINTIFF

CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3722318

9/23/2020- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3722318

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS; Assessed : $55.00; Paid : $55.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/24/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/24/2020; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $0 - $100

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/24/2020; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/24/2020; COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/24/2020; COVER SHEET CIVIL - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/24/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3722318

    Read MoreRead Less