This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 10/03/2020 at 00:01:27 (UTC).

WALKER AUTO GLASS, INC. AS ASSIGNEE OF CINDY HERBERGER VS ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY, A CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 02/03/2020 WALKER AUTO GLASS, INC AS ASSIGNEE OF CINDY HERBERGER filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY, A CORPORATION. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DRAKE, PAULINE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DRAKE, PAULINE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WALKER AUTO GLASS, INC. AS ASSIGNEE OF CINDY HERBERGER

6817 Southpoint Parkway, Suite 1704

Jacksonville, FL 32216

Defendant

ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY, A CORPORATION

2775 Sanders Road

Northbrook, IL 60062

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hampton, Kelly Brook

1015 Atlantic Blvd # 159

Atlantic Beach, FL 32233-3313

Defendant Attorney

Sommers, Alyson Lynn

225 Water St Ste 1585

Jacksonville, FL 32202-5181

 

Court Documents

ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE AND WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

6/12/2020- D19- ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE AND WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

STIPULATION (JOINT) WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AND INVOKING FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE- PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT

6/12/2020- D18- STIPULATION (JOINT) WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AND INVOKING FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE- PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT

ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

4/27/2020- D14- ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (DEFENDANT'S)

4/13/2020- D13- ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (DEFENDANT'S)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ALYSON SOMMERS FOR ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY, A CORPORATION AND DISCLOSURE DESIGNATION OF PRINCIPAL E-MAIL ADDRESS

3/26/2020- D12- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ALYSON SOMMERS FOR ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY, A CORPORATION AND DISCLOSURE DESIGNATION OF PRINCIPAL E-MAIL ADDRESS

ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

3/18/2020- D11- ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

SUMMONS ISSUED ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY

2/4/2020- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY

CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3608085

2/4/2020- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3608085

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY, PLAINTIFF'S

2/3/2020- D3- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY, PLAINTIFF'S

COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF'S

2/3/2020- D1- COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF'S

COMPLAINT PLAINTIFF'S

2/3/2020- D2- COMPLAINT PLAINTIFF'S

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/15/2020; ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE AND WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/12/2020; STIPULATION (JOINT) WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AND INVOKING FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE- PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379;Cancelled: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 06/12/2020 9:00 AM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; > CANCEL REASON - RESCHEDULING DUE TO COVID-19 OR BK19179 PG1359

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; CANCELLED NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ON 4/28/2020 1:30:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/14/2020; ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (DEFENDANT'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/26/2020; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ALYSON SOMMERS FOR ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY, A CORPORATION AND DISCLOSURE DESIGNATION OF PRINCIPAL E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2020; CANCELLED NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ON 3/19/2020 1:30:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS; Assessed : $55.00; Paid : $55.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 03/19/2020 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3608085

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2020; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $0 - $100

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2020; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY, PLAINTIFF'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2020; COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2020; COMPLAINT PLAINTIFF'S

    Read MoreRead Less