Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 01/28/2021 at 23:42:32 (UTC).

WAFAA JOSEPH VS CINDY CLARK

Case Summary

On 02/12/2020 WAFAA JOSEPH filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against CINDY CLARK. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HUDSON, DAWN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HUDSON, DAWN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WAFAA JOSEPH

Jacksonville, FL 32217

Defendant

CINDY CLARK

Jacksonville, FL 32254

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rothstein, Simon Donald

4417 Beach Blvd Ste 104

Jacksonville, FL 32207-4728

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-COMPLIANCE

10/5/2020- D30- AFFIDAVIT OF NON-COMPLIANCE

ORDER ADOPTING STIPULATION

3/23/2020- D28- ORDER ADOPTING STIPULATION

MEMORANDUM TO CASHIER RENT FOR MAR - $300.00 / CF $9.00

3/13/2020- D24- MEMORANDUM TO CASHIER RENT FOR MAR - $300.00 / CF $9.00

RESPONSE TO DEF'S 03/12/2020 FILING, (PLTF, WAFAA JOSEPH

3/13/2020- D22- RESPONSE TO DEF'S 03/12/2020 FILING, (PLTF, WAFAA JOSEPH

CASE FEES PAID: $309.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3637248

3/12/2020- D23- CASE FEES PAID: $309.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3637248

LETTER FILED BY DEFT CINDY CLARK

3/12/2020- D21- LETTER FILED BY DEFT CINDY CLARK

MOTION FOR DISBURSEMENT OF REGISTRY FUNDS - FILED BY PLNTF

3/11/2020- D20- MOTION FOR DISBURSEMENT OF REGISTRY FUNDS - FILED BY PLNTF

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT (AMENDED) AS TO CINDY CLARK

3/11/2020- D19- MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT (AMENDED) AS TO CINDY CLARK

MOTION FOR DEFAULT (JUDICIAL) AS TO CINDY CLARK OTHER

3/11/2020- D18- MOTION FOR DEFAULT (JUDICIAL) AS TO CINDY CLARK OTHER

MEMORANDUM TO CASHIER RENT FOR JAN & FEB $600.00 / CF $16.50

2/28/2020- D11- MEMORANDUM TO CASHIER RENT FOR JAN & FEB $600.00 / CF $16.50

CASE FEES PAID: $616.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3625050

2/28/2020- D10- CASE FEES PAID: $616.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3625050

ANSWER FILED BY CINDY CLARK

2/28/2020- D9- ANSWER FILED BY CINDY CLARK

UNABLE TO ISSUE DEFAULT DEFENDANT FILED AN ANSWER

2/28/2020- D15- UNABLE TO ISSUE DEFAULT DEFENDANT FILED AN ANSWER

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

2/25/2020- D12- NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS SENT TO DEFT. CINDY CLARK

2/14/2020- D7- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS SENT TO DEFT. CINDY CLARK

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

2/12/2020- D2- COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

COVER SHEET

2/12/2020- D1- COVER SHEET

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING - CINDY CLARK

2/12/2020- D4- CERTIFICATE OF MAILING - CINDY CLARK

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/18/2020; WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED ON 11-12-2020 AT 1:20 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : WRIT OF POSSESSION; Assessed : $7.00; Paid : $7.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/3/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $7.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3748245

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/3/2020; WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketEntered: 10/8/2020; FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION BOOK 19404 PAGE 1858-1858

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/5/2020; AFFIDAVIT OF NON-COMPLIANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 3:00 PM; Type : ORDER OF HEARING; Location : CHAMBERS; Courtroom : 725

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/25/2020; MEMO TO DISBURSE FUNDS OF $900.00 TO: WAFAA JOSEPH C/O SIMON D. ROTHSTEIN, ESQ. 4417 BEACH BLVD., STE. 104 JACKSONVILLE, FL 32207 (BAL 0.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/25/2020; ORDER ADOPTING STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/25/2020; ORDER DISBURSING MONEY FROM COURT REGISTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Assessed : $3.50; Paid : $3.50; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/REMOVAL OF TENANT ACTION; Assessed : $185.00; Paid : $185.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS SENT TO DEFT. CINDY CLARK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $198.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3615281

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; EVICTION/DISTRESS FOR RENT - OR REMOVAL OF TENANT (NON-MONETARY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; CERTIFICATE OF MAILING - CINDY CLARK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED - CINDY CLARK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rothstein, Simon Donald