This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 07/30/2020 at 01:54:11 (UTC).

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS BANK OF AMERICA NA Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/04/2020 US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against BANK OF AMERICA NA. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HIGBEE, RONALD P.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HIGBEE, RONALD P.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

2424 North Federal Highway Suite 360

Boca Raton, FL 33431

Defendants

HIGHLAND IMPROVEMENTS LLC

1 Vincent Lane

Armonk, NY 10504

IBERIABANK

1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

Unknown Party In Possession #1

Jacksonville, FL 32225

MICHAEL P ROSENBERGER

Jacksonville, FL 32225

BANK OF AMERICA NA

1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

COMMUNITY FIRST CREDIT UNION OF FLORIDA

637 North Lee Street

Jacksonville, FL 32204

Unknown Party In Possession #2

Jacksonville, FL 32225

Unknown Spouse Of Michael P Rosenberger Aka Michael

Jacksonville, FL 32225

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Concilio, Amy Lorraine

4630 Woodland Corporate Blvd Ste 100

Tampa, FL 33614-2429

 

Court Documents

RECEIPT NUMBER 3608706 HAD A REFUND OF $140.00 AMOUNT SENT TO SHAPIRO FISHMAN GACHE LLP

3/10/2020- D19- RECEIPT NUMBER 3608706 HAD A REFUND OF $140.00 AMOUNT SENT TO SHAPIRO FISHMAN GACHE LLP

CASE FEES PAID: $387.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3608706

3/9/2020- D20- CASE FEES PAID: $387.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3608706

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS

2/13/2020- D17- NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM - DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING - OTHER

2/13/2020- D16- FINAL DISPOSITION FORM - DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING - OTHER

CASE FEES PAID: $527.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3608706

2/4/2020- D15- CASE FEES PAID: $527.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3608706

SUMMONS ISSUED ; UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION #2

2/4/2020- D13- SUMMONS ISSUED ; UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION #2

SUMMONS ISSUED ; UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION #1

2/4/2020- D12- SUMMONS ISSUED ; UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION #1

SUMMONS ISSUED ; IBERIABANK

2/4/2020- D11- SUMMONS ISSUED ; IBERIABANK

SUMMONS ISSUED ; HIGHLAND IMPROVEMENTS, LLC

2/4/2020- D10- SUMMONS ISSUED ; HIGHLAND IMPROVEMENTS, LLC

SUMMONS ISSUED ; COMMUNITY FIRST CREDIT UNION OF FLORIDA

2/4/2020- D9- SUMMONS ISSUED ; COMMUNITY FIRST CREDIT UNION OF FLORIDA

SUMMONS ISSUED ; BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

2/4/2020- D8- SUMMONS ISSUED ; BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

SUMMONS ISSUED ; UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MICHAEL P. ROSENBERGER A/K/A MICHAEL ROSENBERGER

2/4/2020- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED ; UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MICHAEL P. ROSENBERGER A/K/A MICHAEL ROSENBERGER

SUMMONS ISSUED ; MICHAEL P. ROSENBERGER A/K/A MICHAEL ROSENBERGER

2/4/2020- D6- SUMMONS ISSUED ; MICHAEL P. ROSENBERGER A/K/A MICHAEL ROSENBERGER

NOTICE OF FILING ; CERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

2/4/2020- D5- NOTICE OF FILING ; CERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

2/4/2020- D4- VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

2/4/2020- D3- NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

COMPLAINT/STATEMENT OF CLAIM/PETITION

2/4/2020- D2- COMPLAINT/STATEMENT OF CLAIM/PETITION

COVER SHEET

2/4/2020- D1- COVER SHEET

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : REFUNDCHECK; Assessed : $140.00; Paid : $140.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/10/2020; RECEIPT NUMBER 3608706 HAD A REFUND OF $140.00 AMOUNT SENT TO SHAPIRO FISHMAN GACHE LLP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/10/2020; RECEIPT NUMBER 3608706 REVISED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/10/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $387.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3608706

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 19107 PAGE 1824-1826

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; FINAL DISPOSITION FORM - DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING - OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/FORECLOSURE; Assessed : $300.00; Paid : $300.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/5/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED ; HIGHLAND IMPROVEMENTS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/5/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED ; COMMUNITY FIRST CREDIT UNION OF FLORIDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/5/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED ; BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/5/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED ; UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MICHAEL P. ROSENBERGER A/K/A MICHAEL ROSENBERGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/5/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED ; MICHAEL P. ROSENBERGER A/K/A MICHAEL ROSENBERGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/5/2020; NOTICE OF FILING ; CERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/5/2020; VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/5/2020; NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 19097 PAGE 882-883

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/5/2020; COMPLAINT/STATEMENT OF CLAIM/PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/5/2020; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less