This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 10/09/2020 at 18:02:59 (UTC).

TRACY JONES VS JACKSONVILLE HOUSING AUTHORITY

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 TRACY JONES filed an Other lawsuit against JACKSONVILLE HOUSING AUTHORITY. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WALLACE, III, WADDELL A.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WALLACE, III, WADDELL A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TRACY JONES

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Defendant

JACKSONVILLE HOUSING AUTHORITY

1300 North Broad Street

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Luciano, Antonio Jr

Morgan & Morgan 76 S Laura St Ste 1100

Jacksonville, FL 32202-5413

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

9/25/2020- D2- COMPLAINT

CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3723334

9/25/2020- D8- CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3723334

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CIR/GENERALCIVIL 7/1/2019; Assessed : $401.00; Paid : $401.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3723334

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; OTHER NEGLIGENCE-PREMISES LIABILITY-RESIDENTIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFT., JACKSONVILLE HOUSING AUTHORITY (PLTF. FIRST)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT., JACKSONVILLE HOUSING AUTHORITY (PLTF.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFT., JACKSONVILLE HOUSING AUTHORITY (PLTF. FIRST)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED TO JACKSONVILLE HOUSING AUTHORITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less