This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 01/29/2021 at 01:52:32 (UTC).

TLC CHIROPRACTIC, INC. AS ASSIGNEE OF SHENESHIA STANSEL VS ESURANCE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/18/2020 TLC CHIROPRACTIC, INC AS ASSIGNEE OF SHENESHIA STANSEL filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ESURANCE PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DERKE, ELENI ELIA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DERKE, ELENI ELIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TLC CHIROPRACTIC, INC. AS ASSIGNEE OF SHENESHIA STANSEL

Defendant

ESURANCE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Saben, Adam B

10245 Centurion Pkwy N Ste 109

Jacksonville, FL 32256-0569

 

Court Documents

ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

4/27/2020- D10- ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PLAINTIFF

4/10/2020- D9- NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT (PLAINTIFF'S)

4/2/2020- D8- NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT (PLAINTIFF'S)

SUMMONS ISSUED - ENSURANCE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

2/20/2020- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED - ENSURANCE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3617855

2/18/2020- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3617855

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR ENSURANCE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY - PLAINTIFF

2/18/2020- D3- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR ENSURANCE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY - PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

2/18/2020- D2- COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

COVER SHEET - (CIVIL) - PLAINTIFF

2/18/2020- D1- COVER SHEET - (CIVIL) - PLAINTIFF

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379;Cancelled: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketEntered: 5/12/2020; > CANCEL REASON - DISMISSAL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketEntered: 5/12/2020; CANCELLED NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ON 6/26/2020 9:00:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 06/26/2020 9:00 AM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; > CANCEL REASON - RESCHEDULING DUE TO COVID-19 OR BK19179 PG1359

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; CANCELLED NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ON 4/2/2020 1:30:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/13/2020; NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379;Cancelled: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/6/2020; NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT (PLAINTIFF'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS>$500/=; Assessed : $175.00; Paid : $175.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/20/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED - ENSURANCE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/20/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 04/02/2020 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/20/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3617855

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/20/2020; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $501 - $2,500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/20/2020; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR ENSURANCE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/20/2020; COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/20/2020; COVER SHEET - (CIVIL) - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TLC CHIROPRACTIC, INC. AS ASSIGNEE OF ARIEL BRIDGES is a litigant

Latest cases where ESURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Saben, Adam B