This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 10/09/2020 at 15:31:54 (UTC).

THIDA LIM

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 THIDA LIM was filed as a Property - Other Property lawsuit. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FLOYD, MOSE L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FLOYD, MOSE L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

THIDA LIM

Jacksonville, FL 32205

Naron Chhem

Defendant

JACK JOHNSON

Jacksonville, FL 32205

 

Court Documents

LETTER -FILED BY PLAINTIFF THIDA LIM

10/7/2020- D13- LETTER -FILED BY PLAINTIFF THIDA LIM

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT -AS TO DEFENDANT JACK JOHNSON

10/7/2020- D12- NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT -AS TO DEFENDANT JACK JOHNSON

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT -AS TO DEFENDANT JACK JOHNSON

10/7/2020- D11- MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT -AS TO DEFENDANT JACK JOHNSON

UNABLE TO ISSUE DEFAULT -AS TO DEFENDANT JACK JOHNSON DUE TO ANSWER FILED

10/7/2020- D10- UNABLE TO ISSUE DEFAULT -AS TO DEFENDANT JACK JOHNSON DUE TO ANSWER FILED

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT (ONE PAGE) -AS TO DEFENDANT JACK JOHNSON

10/7/2020- D9- MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT (ONE PAGE) -AS TO DEFENDANT JACK JOHNSON

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 09/26/2020 @ 8:11AM TO DEFENDNT JACK JOHNSON (INDIVIDUAL)

10/7/2020- D8- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 09/26/2020 @ 8:11AM TO DEFENDNT JACK JOHNSON (INDIVIDUAL)

ANSWER -FILED BY DEFENDANT THIDA LIM

10/5/2020- D7- ANSWER -FILED BY DEFENDANT THIDA LIM

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS SENT TO DEFENDANT JACK JOHNSON

9/25/2020- D5- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS SENT TO DEFENDANT JACK JOHNSON

SUMMONS ISSUED JACK JOHNSON

9/25/2020- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED JACK JOHNSON

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

9/25/2020- D3- COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

COVER SHEET

9/25/2020- D2- COVER SHEET

CASE FEES PAID: $195.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3723174

9/25/2020- D6- CASE FEES PAID: $195.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3723174

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/7/2020; LETTER -FILED BY PLAINTIFF THIDA LIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/7/2020; NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT -AS TO DEFENDANT JACK JOHNSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/7/2020; MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT -AS TO DEFENDANT JACK JOHNSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/7/2020; UNABLE TO ISSUE DEFAULT -AS TO DEFENDANT JACK JOHNSON DUE TO ANSWER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/7/2020; MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT (ONE PAGE) -AS TO DEFENDANT JACK JOHNSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/7/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 09/26/2020 @ 8:11AM TO DEFENDNT JACK JOHNSON (INDIVIDUAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/5/2020; ANSWER -FILED BY DEFENDANT THIDA LIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/REMOVAL OF TENANT ACTION; Assessed : $185.00; Paid : $185.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $195.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3723174

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS SENT TO DEFENDANT JACK JOHNSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED JACK JOHNSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; EVICTION/DISTRESS FOR RENT - OR REMOVAL OF TENANT (NON-MONETARY)

    Read MoreRead Less