This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 03/23/2020 at 20:53:30 (UTC).

THE VUE AT BAYMEADOWS LP VS HAYLEY WAISANEN

Case Summary

On 02/19/2020 THE VUE AT BAYMEADOWS LP filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against HAYLEY WAISANEN. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FLOYD, MOSE L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FLOYD, MOSE L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE VUE AT BAYMEADOWS LP

Po Box 62884

Ft. Myers, FL 33906

Defendant

HAYLEY WAISANEN

Jacksonville, FL 32256

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wolk, Brian Peter

Attorney at Heist, Weisse & Wolk P.A.

5246 Clayton Ct

Fort Myers, FL 33907-2116

 

Court Documents

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT AS TO HAYLEY WAISANEN

3/4/2020- D11- NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT AS TO HAYLEY WAISANEN

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON HAYLEY WAISANEN; INDIVIDUALLY SERVED ON 2/29/20 @ 12:00PM

3/4/2020- D10- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON HAYLEY WAISANEN; INDIVIDUALLY SERVED ON 2/29/20 @ 12:00PM

STIPULATION OF PAYMENTS -SIGNED BY BOTH PARTIES

3/4/2020- D9- STIPULATION OF PAYMENTS -SIGNED BY BOTH PARTIES

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS BRIAN P WOLK, AS ATTORNEY FOR THE VUE AT BAYMEADOWS, LP

2/21/2020- D8- DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS BRIAN P WOLK, AS ATTORNEY FOR THE VUE AT BAYMEADOWS, LP

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS ENTERED UPON HATLEY WAISANEN

2/21/2020- D7- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS ENTERED UPON HATLEY WAISANEN

SUMMONS ISSUED HAYLEY WAISANEN

2/19/2020- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED HAYLEY WAISANEN

COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

2/19/2020- D2- COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF'S (CIVIL)

2/19/2020- D1- COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF'S (CIVIL)

CASE FEES PAID: $198.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3618965

2/21/2020- D6- CASE FEES PAID: $198.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3618965

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR HAYLEY WAISANEN

2/19/2020- D3- CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR HAYLEY WAISANEN

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/4/2020; NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT AS TO HAYLEY WAISANEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/4/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON HAYLEY WAISANEN; INDIVIDUALLY SERVED ON 2/29/20 @ 12:00PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/4/2020; STIPULATION OF PAYMENTS -SIGNED BY BOTH PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/REMOVAL OF TENANT ACTION; Assessed : $185.00; Paid : $185.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Assessed : $3.50; Paid : $3.50; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/24/2020; DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS BRIAN P WOLK, AS ATTORNEY FOR THE VUE AT BAYMEADOWS, LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2020; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS ENTERED UPON HATLEY WAISANEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $198.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3618965

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2020; EVICTION/DISTRESS FOR RENT - OR REMOVAL OF TENANT (NON-MONETARY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED HAYLEY WAISANEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2020; CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR HAYLEY WAISANEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2020; COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2020; COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF'S (CIVIL)

    Read MoreRead Less