This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 01/31/2021 at 02:47:03 (UTC).

THE LAW OFFICES OF RONALD E. SHOLES P.A. VS Advanced Medical Associates Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/11/2020 THE LAW OFFICES OF RONALD E SHOLES P A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Advanced Medical Associates. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MITCHELL, SCOTT F.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MITCHELL, SCOTT F.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE LAW OFFICES OF RONALD E. SHOLES P.A.

Defendants

Bean & Brooks

Surgical Monitoring Services

Beaches Open Mri

Advanced Medical Associates

Banyan Finance F/B/O Injured Workers Pharmacy

Nassau County Fire & Rescue

Oasis Legal Finance Llc

Memorial Hospital

Prescription Partners Llc

Sea Spine Orthopedic Institute

Emergency Resources Group

NANCY DENSLOW

Mori

Florida Medical Center

Robinson Chiropractic

Farah & Farah Law Firm

Baptist Health

Global Neuro & Spine Institute

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wade, Joe Harrison II

76 S Laura St Ste 1100

Jacksonville, FL 32202-5413

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE TO: NASSAU COUNTY FIRE & RESCUE ACCEPTED BY: CAROLYN KITTLE ADMIN. SPECIALIST ON 12/21/18 @ 10:55 AM

1/2/2019- D40- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE TO: NASSAU COUNTY FIRE & RESCUE ACCEPTED BY: CAROLYN KITTLE ADMIN. SPECIALIST ON 12/21/18 @ 10:55 AM

MOTION FOR DEFAULT /DEFT, SEA SPINE ORHTOPEDIC INSTITUTE, LLC MODIFICATION

2/22/2019- D44- MOTION FOR DEFAULT /DEFT, SEA SPINE ORHTOPEDIC INSTITUTE, LLC MODIFICATION

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON BEACHES OPEN MRI 12/10/2018 @230PM BY PAT DICKINS

12/19/2018- D34- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON BEACHES OPEN MRI 12/10/2018 @230PM BY PAT DICKINS

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE - SURGICAL MONITORING SERVICES - 12/05/18 11:17AM - CORP SERV: RAZIUR RAHMAN

12/17/2018- D23- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE - SURGICAL MONITORING SERVICES - 12/05/18 11:17AM - CORP SERV: RAZIUR RAHMAN

SUMMONS ISSUED TO EMERGENCY RESOURCES GROUP

11/14/2018- D15- SUMMONS ISSUED TO EMERGENCY RESOURCES GROUP

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE - PRESCRIPTION PARTNERS - 12/05/18 10:45AM - CORP SERV: LIZA ARRUDA

12/17/2018- D25- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE - PRESCRIPTION PARTNERS - 12/05/18 10:45AM - CORP SERV: LIZA ARRUDA

NOTICE OF CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER TRANSFERING CASE TO COUNTY CIVIL

6/11/2020- D52- NOTICE OF CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER TRANSFERING CASE TO COUNTY CIVIL

COMPLAINT (INTERPLEADER)

11/14/2018- D2- COMPLAINT (INTERPLEADER)

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE - FARAH AND FARAH LAW FIRM - 12/05/18 10:30AM - SUBST SERV: RICK BROOKS

12/17/2018- D29- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE - FARAH AND FARAH LAW FIRM - 12/05/18 10:30AM - SUBST SERV: RICK BROOKS

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS >$2500 <=$15,000 1/1/2020; Assessed : $300.00; Paid : $300.00; Balance : $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/11/2020; NOTICE OF TRANSFER (CERTIFIED MAILING NUMBER 70160910000236450165)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/11/2020; NOTICE OF CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER TRANSFERING CASE TO COUNTY CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/11/2020; NOTICE OF CERTIFIED COPY OF DOCKET LIST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/11/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $300.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3673777

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketEntered: 6/11/2020; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $8000 - $15000

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketEntered: 6/11/2020; TRANSFER TO DIV. CC-G (CIVIL)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketEntered: 6/10/2020; NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO COUNTY COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketEntered: 6/20/2019; ANSWER TO AMENDED PETITION -DEFT ALL PARTNERS NETWORK DBA GLOBAL NEURO & SPINE INSTITUTIE & ULAB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • DocketEntered: 3/15/2019; ORDER GRANTING PLTF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT CASE CAPTION AND TRANSFER CAUSE TO COUNTY COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 11/14/2018
  • DocketEntered: 11/19/2018; SUMMONS ISSUED TO SEA SPINE ORTHOPEDIC INSTITUTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • DocketEntered: 11/19/2018; SUMMONS ISSUED TO HOSPITAL LIEN STRATEGIES F/B/O FLORIDA MEDICAL CENTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • DocketEntered: 11/19/2018; SUMMONS ISSUED TO SURGICAL MONITORING SERVICES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • DocketEntered: 11/19/2018; SUMMONS ISSUED TO PRESCRIPTION PARTNERS LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • DocketEntered: 11/19/2018; SUMMONS ISSUED TO BEACHES OPEN MRI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • DocketEntered: 11/19/2018; SUMMONS ISSUED TO MEMORIAL HOSPITAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • DocketEntered: 11/19/2018; SUMMONS ISSUED TO OASIS LEGAL FINANCE LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • DocketEntered: 11/19/2018; SUMMONS ISSUED TO FARAH & FARAH LAW FIRM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/19/2018; COMPLAINT (INTERPLEADER)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • DocketEntered: 11/19/2018; COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less