This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 01/29/2021 at 04:16:58 (UTC).

SUNTREE MHC LLC VS JOSEPH ALCIDE

Case Summary

On 02/24/2020 SUNTREE MHC LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against JOSEPH ALCIDE. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ARIAS, ROBERTO A.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ARIAS, ROBERTO A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUNTREE MHC LLC

4259 Philips Highway

Jacksonville, FL 32207

Defendant

JOSEPH ALCIDE

Jacksonville, FL 32207

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gabel, Jody Blouch

2 N Tamiami Trl Ste 500

Sarasota, FL 34236-5575

 

Court Documents

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM DISPOSED BY OTHER :PLAINTIFF

10/14/2020- D20- FINAL DISPOSITION FORM DISPOSED BY OTHER :PLAINTIFF

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

8/18/2020- D17- WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT FOR JOSEPH ALCIDE -FILED BY PLTF

3/23/2020- D13- NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT FOR JOSEPH ALCIDE -FILED BY PLTF

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AS TO COUNT I -FILED BY PLTF MODIFICATION

3/23/2020- D11- MOTION FOR DEFAULT AS TO COUNT I -FILED BY PLTF MODIFICATION

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED ON 02/28/20, @10:09AM, TO JOSEPH AALCIDE(COUNT II), NOT SERVED

3/19/2020- D10- SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED ON 02/28/20, @10:09AM, TO JOSEPH AALCIDE(COUNT II), NOT SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 02/28/20, @10:09AM, TO JOSEPH AALCIDE(COUNT I), POSTED

3/19/2020- D9- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 02/28/20, @10:09AM, TO JOSEPH AALCIDE(COUNT I), POSTED

CASE FEES PAID: $208.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3622097

2/26/2020- D7- CASE FEES PAID: $208.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3622097

SUMMONS ISSUED JOSEPH ALCIDE (COUNT 2)

2/24/2020- D3- SUMMONS ISSUED JOSEPH ALCIDE (COUNT 2)

SUMMONS ISSUED JOSEPH ALCIDE (COUNT 1)

2/24/2020- D2- SUMMONS ISSUED JOSEPH ALCIDE (COUNT 1)

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE :PLAINTIFF

10/14/2020- D19- NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE :PLAINTIFF

CASE FEES PAID: $7.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3701665

8/18/2020- D18- CASE FEES PAID: $7.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3701665

ORDER TEMPORARILY STAYING EVICTIONS FOR NON -PAYMENT AND REQUIRING FURTHER PLEADING FROM PLAINTIFF

6/11/2020- D16- ORDER TEMPORARILY STAYING EVICTIONS FOR NON -PAYMENT AND REQUIRING FURTHER PLEADING FROM PLAINTIFF

DEFAULT AGAINST JOSEPH ALCIDE

3/24/2020- D14- DEFAULT AGAINST JOSEPH ALCIDE

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT -FILED BY PLTF

3/23/2020- D12- MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT -FILED BY PLTF

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS ENTERED UPON JOSEPH ALCIDE

2/26/2020- D8- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS ENTERED UPON JOSEPH ALCIDE

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR JOSEPH ALCIDE

2/24/2020- D5- CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR JOSEPH ALCIDE

COMPLAINT TO EVICT AND DAMAGES

2/24/2020- D4- COMPLAINT TO EVICT AND DAMAGES

COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF'S (CIVIL)

2/24/2020- D1- COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF'S (CIVIL)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/14/2020; FINAL DISPOSITION FORM DISPOSED BY OTHER :PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/14/2020; NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE :PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : WRIT OF POSSESSION; Assessed : $7.00; Paid : $7.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/18/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $7.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3701665

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/18/2020; WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/12/2020; ORDER TEMPORARILY STAYING EVICTIONS FOR NON -PAYMENT AND REQUIRING FURTHER PLEADING FROM PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/31/2020; FINAL JUDGMENT (DEFAULT) FOR POSSESSION BOOK 19161 PAGE 1460-1460

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/24/2020; DEFAULT AGAINST JOSEPH ALCIDE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/24/2020; NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT FOR JOSEPH ALCIDE -FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/24/2020; MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT -FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Assessed : $3.50; Paid : $3.50; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/26/2020; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS ENTERED UPON JOSEPH ALCIDE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/26/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $208.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3622097

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/26/2020; EVICTION/DISTRESS FOR RENT - OR REMOVAL OF TENANT (UP TO $15000)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/26/2020; CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR JOSEPH ALCIDE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/26/2020; COMPLAINT TO EVICT AND DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/26/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED JOSEPH ALCIDE (COUNT 2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/26/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED JOSEPH ALCIDE (COUNT 1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/26/2020; COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF'S (CIVIL)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GABEL JODY B