This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 10/09/2020 at 18:05:13 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA Et Al VS ROGER DALE BROOKS Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other lawsuit against ROGER DALE BROOKS. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MAHON, MARK H.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MAHON, MARK H.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

STATE OF FLORIDA

311 W Monroe Street

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Defendant and Respondent

ROGER DALE BROOKS

Lake Butler, FL 32054

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Hixon, Anna Eileen

State Attorney'S Office - 4Th Circuit 311 W Monroe St

Jacksonville, FL 32202-4242

Lorimier, Jon Pierre

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:30 AM; Type : STATUS CONFERENCE; Location : 6th Floor; Courtroom : 611

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketEntered: 10/2/2020; MOTION FOR INITIAL COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketEntered: 10/2/2020; WAIVER OF RIGHT TO TRIAL WITHIN THIRTY DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketEntered: 10/2/2020; WAIVER OF RIGHT TO ADVERSARIAL PRELIMINARY HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketEntered: 10/2/2020; ANSWER (RESPONDENT'S) TO STATE'S PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 11:00 AM; Type : APPEARANCE DATE; Location : 6th Floor; Courtroom : 611

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketEntered: 10/1/2020; STATUS CONFERENCE 11/19/2020 9:30 AM - 611 6TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketEntered: 10/1/2020; CLERK'S MEMORANDUM OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketEntered: 10/1/2020; ORDER TO TRANSPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/29/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON ROGER DALE BROOKS ON 9-28-2020 @ 13:08

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/28/2020; ORDER DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE AND DIRECTING RESPONDENT BE TAKEN INTO CUSTODY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/28/2020; WARRANT FOR CUSTODIAL DETENTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; TRANSFER TO DIV. CV-CJ (CIRCUIT COURT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; INVOLUNTARY CIVIL COMMITMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED -ROGER DALE BROOKS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; MOTION FOR A PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION AND ORDER DIRECTING RESPONDENT TO BE TAKEN INTO CUSTODY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; PETITION TO HAVE RESPONDENT DECALRED A SEXUALLY VIOLENT PREDATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less