Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 01/28/2021 at 23:35:01 (UTC).

STAND-UP MRI OF TALLAHASSEE, PA A/A/O SHILOH MONTFORD VS ALPHA PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/12/2020 STAND-UP MRI OF TALLAHASSEE, PA A/A/O SHILOH MONTFORD filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ALPHA PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RUTH, JAMES A.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RUTH, JAMES A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STAND-UP MRI OF TALLAHASSEE, PA A/A/O SHILOH MONTFORD

Defendant

ALPHA PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Willis, L Darren

76 S Laura St Ste 1100

Jacksonville, FL 32202-5413

Defendant Attorney

Herman, Zachary D

13578 100Th Pl

Seminole, FL 33776-1416

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PLAINTIFF

1/27/2021- D17- NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PLAINTIFF

ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (DEFENDANT'S)

7/8/2020- D16- ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (DEFENDANT'S)

WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL (JOINT STIPULATION) - BOTH PARTIES

6/19/2020- D15- WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL (JOINT STIPULATION) - BOTH PARTIES

ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

4/27/2020- D14- ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ZACHARY HERMAN FOR ALPHA PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY -DEFENDANT

3/26/2020- D13- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ZACHARY HERMAN FOR ALPHA PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY -DEFENDANT

ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

3/18/2020- D12- ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS OF SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY DELIVERED TO ALPHA PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY C/O DONNA MOCH 2/26/20

2/26/2020- D8- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS OF SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY DELIVERED TO ALPHA PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY C/O DONNA MOCH 2/26/20

SUMMONS ISSUED ALPHA PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

2/13/2020- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED ALPHA PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR ALPHA PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY :PLAINTIFF

2/12/2020- D3- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR ALPHA PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY :PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT :PLAINTIFF

2/12/2020- D2- COMPLAINT :PLAINTIFF

COVER SHEET :PLAINTIFF

2/12/2020- D1- COVER SHEET :PLAINTIFF

CASE FEES PAID: $90.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3614564

2/13/2020- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $90.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3614564

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/27/2021; NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/8/2020; ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (DEFENDANT'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/19/2020; WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL (JOINT STIPULATION) - BOTH PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379;Cancelled: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/26/2020; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ZACHARY HERMAN FOR ALPHA PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY -DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2020; ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 05/05/2020 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2020; > CANCEL REASON - RESCHEDULING FOR PUBLICS SAFETY DUE TO COVID-19 VIRUS - OR BK19140 PG2388

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/26/2020; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS OF SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY DELIVERED TO ALPHA PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY C/O DONNA MOCH 2/26/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS=>$100/=; Assessed : $80.00; Paid : $80.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/13/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED ALPHA PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/13/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 03/26/2020 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/13/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $90.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3614564

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/13/2020; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $101 - $500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/13/2020; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR ALPHA PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY :PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/13/2020; COMPLAINT :PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/13/2020; COVER SHEET :PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALPHA PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Willis, L Darren