This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 07/16/2020 at 14:23:03 (UTC).

SPYGLASS - THE CANOPY, LLC D/B/A THE MERIDIAN SPYGLASS -THE CANOPY, LLC D/B/A THE MERIDIAN VS ADRIENNE HARLEY

Case Summary

On 02/19/2020 SPYGLASS - THE CANOPY, LLC D/B/A THE MERIDIAN SPYGLASS -THE CANOPY, LLC D/B/A THE MERIDIAN filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against ADRIENNE HARLEY. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MITCHELL, SCOTT F.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MITCHELL, SCOTT F.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SPYGLASS - THE CANOPY, LLC D/B/A THE MERIDIAN SPYGLASS -THE CANOPY, LLC D/B/A THE MERIDIAN

C/O Fred Elefant, Esquire 1301 Riverplace Boulevard, Suite 1500

Jacksonville, FL 32207

SPYGLASS - THE CANOPY, LLC D/B/A THE MERIDIAN

C/O Fred Elefant, Esquire 1301 Riverplace Boulevard, Suite 1500

Jacksonville, FL 32207

Defendant

ADRIENNE HARLEY

Jacksonville, FL 32225

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Elefant, Fred

1301 Riverplace Blvd Ste 1500

Jacksonville, FL 32207-1811

 

Court Documents

DEFAULT AS TO ADRIENNE HARLEY

3/2/2020- D11- DEFAULT AS TO ADRIENNE HARLEY

MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT/WRIT OF POSS/MIL AFF/PROOF OF CLAIM AND AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE FOR ADRIENNE HARLEY

3/2/2020- D10- MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT/WRIT OF POSS/MIL AFF/PROOF OF CLAIM AND AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE FOR ADRIENNE HARLEY

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT (ONE PAGE) ADRIENNE HARLEY

3/2/2020- D9- MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT (ONE PAGE) ADRIENNE HARLEY

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 02/21/2020 02:30PM POSTED, ADRIENNE HARLEY

2/26/2020- D8- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 02/21/2020 02:30PM POSTED, ADRIENNE HARLEY

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS

2/20/2020- D7- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS

CASE FEES PAID: $198.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3617827

2/20/2020- D6- CASE FEES PAID: $198.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3617827

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR ADRIENNE HARLEY

2/19/2020- D4- CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR ADRIENNE HARLEY

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR ADRIENNE HARLEY

2/19/2020- D3- SUMMONS ISSUED FOR ADRIENNE HARLEY

COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

2/19/2020- D2- COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

COVER SHEET

2/19/2020- D1- COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/5/2020; FINAL JUDGMENT FOR EVICTION BOOK 19132 PAGE 1813-1813

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/2/2020; DEFAULT AS TO ADRIENNE HARLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/2/2020; MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT/WRIT OF POSS/MIL AFF/PROOF OF CLAIM AND AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE FOR ADRIENNE HARLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/2/2020; MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT (ONE PAGE) ADRIENNE HARLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/27/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 02/21/2020 02:30PM POSTED, ADRIENNE HARLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/REMOVAL OF TENANT ACTION; Assessed : $185.00; Paid : $185.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Assessed : $3.50; Paid : $3.50; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/20/2020; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS SENT TO ADRIENNE HARLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/20/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $198.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3617827

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/20/2020; EVICTION/DISTRESS FOR RENT - OR REMOVAL OF TENANT (NON-MONETARY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/20/2020; CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR ADRIENNE HARLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/20/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED FOR ADRIENNE HARLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/20/2020; COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/20/2020; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less