This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 10/08/2020 at 15:50:07 (UTC).

SPINE LIFE CHIROPRACTIC, LLC A/A/O SAMUEL STEELE VS ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 SPINE LIFE CHIROPRACTIC, LLC A/A/O SAMUEL STEELE filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HUDSON, DAWN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HUDSON, DAWN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SPINE LIFE CHIROPRACTIC, LLC A/A/O SAMUEL STEELE

10245 Centurion Parkway N 305

Jacksonville, FL 32256

Defendant

ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

200 E.Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Saben, Adam B

10245 Centurion Pkwy N Ste 109

Jacksonville, FL 32256-0569

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED ALLSTATE FIRE AND CAUSALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

9/24/2020- D6- SUMMONS ISSUED ALLSTATE FIRE AND CAUSALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY - PLAINTIFF

9/24/2020- D3- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY - PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

9/24/2020- D2- COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

COVER SHEET CIVIL - PLAINTIFF

9/24/2020- D1- COVER SHEET CIVIL - PLAINTIFF

CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3722563

9/22/2020- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3722563

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS; Assessed : $55.00; Paid : $55.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/24/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED ALLSTATE FIRE AND CAUSALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/24/2020; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $0 - $100

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/24/2020; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/24/2020; COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/24/2020; COVER SHEET CIVIL - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/24/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3722563

    Read MoreRead Less