This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 10/08/2020 at 15:51:42 (UTC).

SOUTHSIDE CHIROPRACTIC CENTRE, INC. (A/A/O IBREC BLAKELY) VS OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 SOUTHSIDE CHIROPRACTIC CENTRE, INC A/A/O IBREC BLAKELY filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LANIGAN, ROBIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LANIGAN, ROBIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOUTHSIDE CHIROPRACTIC CENTRE, INC. (A/A/O IBREC BLAKELY)

Defendant

OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tadros, Chris

12 Se 7Th St Ste 803

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33301-3434

Defendant Attorney

Silvanic, Benjamin William

11555 Heron Bay Blvd Ste 100A

Pompano Beach, FL 33076-3360

 

Court Documents

MAIL RECEIPT RETURNED UNDELIVERED

10/2/2020- D6- MAIL RECEIPT RETURNED UNDELIVERED

NOTICE OF TRANSFER FROM BROWARD CO TO DUVAL CO

9/24/2020- D4- NOTICE OF TRANSFER FROM BROWARD CO TO DUVAL CO

DOCKET LIST

9/24/2020- D3- DOCKET LIST

CASE TRANSFERRED TO DUVAL FROM ANOTHER COUNTY (BROWARD) COCE20016448

9/24/2020- D2- CASE TRANSFERRED TO DUVAL FROM ANOTHER COUNTY (BROWARD) COCE20016448

CASE FEES PAID: $55.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3722369

9/24/2020- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $55.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3722369

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/5/2020; MAIL RECEIPT RETURNED UNDELIVERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS; Assessed : $55.00; Paid : $55.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/24/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $55.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3722369

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/24/2020; NOTICE OF TRANSFER FROM BROWARD CO TO DUVAL CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/24/2020; DOCKET LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/24/2020; CASE TRANSFERRED TO DUVAL FROM ANOTHER COUNTY (BROWARD) COCE20016448

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/24/2020; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $0 - $100

    Read MoreRead Less