This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 10/09/2020 at 15:33:18 (UTC).

SOPRANOS, LLC VS WILLIAM THOMPSON Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 SOPRANOS, LLC filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against WILLIAM THOMPSON. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MORAN, JOHN A.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MORAN, JOHN A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOPRANOS, LLC

500 Westover Dr., Unit 10937

Sanford, NC 27220

Defendants

WILLIAM THOMPSON

Jacksonville, FL 32244

YOLANDA THOMPSON

Jacksonville, FL 32244

Not Classified By Court

FLORIDA LANDLORD NETWORK

Jacksonville, FL 32238

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS FOR WILLIAM THOMAS

9/28/2020- D13- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS FOR WILLIAM THOMAS

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS FOR WILLIAM THOMPSON

9/28/2020- D12- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS FOR WILLIAM THOMPSON

UNABLE TO ISSUE CERT. OF MAILING TO BE ISSUED AT A LATER DATE FOR YOLANDA THOMPSON

9/25/2020- D11- UNABLE TO ISSUE CERT. OF MAILING TO BE ISSUED AT A LATER DATE FOR YOLANDA THOMPSON

UNABLE TO ISSUE CERT. OF MAILING TO BE ISSUED AT A LATER DATE FOR WILLIAM THOMPSON

9/25/2020- D10- UNABLE TO ISSUE CERT. OF MAILING TO BE ISSUED AT A LATER DATE FOR WILLIAM THOMPSON

COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

9/25/2020- D7- COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR WILLIAM THOMPSON

9/25/2020- D6- SUMMONS ISSUED FOR WILLIAM THOMPSON

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR YOLANDA THOMPSON

9/25/2020- D5- SUMMONS ISSUED FOR YOLANDA THOMPSON

AUTHORIZATION FORM INDICATING PERSON DOING BUSNESS ON BEHALF OF

9/25/2020- D2- AUTHORIZATION FORM INDICATING PERSON DOING BUSNESS ON BEHALF OF

COVER SHEET

9/25/2020- D1- COVER SHEET

CASE FEES PAID: $212.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3723135

9/25/2020- D9- CASE FEES PAID: $212.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3723135

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR WILLIAM THOMPSON

9/25/2020- D4- CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR WILLIAM THOMPSON

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR YOLANDA THOMPSON

9/25/2020- D3- CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR YOLANDA THOMPSON

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/28/2020; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS FOR WILLIAM THOMAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/28/2020; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS FOR WILLIAM THOMPSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Assessed : $3.50; Paid : $3.50; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/REMOVAL OF TENANT ACTION; Assessed : $185.00; Paid : $185.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Assessed : $3.50; Paid : $3.50; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; UNABLE TO ISSUE CERT. OF MAILING TO BE ISSUED AT A LATER DATE FOR YOLANDA THOMPSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; UNABLE TO ISSUE CERT. OF MAILING TO BE ISSUED AT A LATER DATE FOR WILLIAM THOMPSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $212.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3723135

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; EVICTION/DISTRESS FOR RENT - OR REMOVAL OF TENANT (NON-MONETARY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED FOR WILLIAM THOMPSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED FOR YOLANDA THOMPSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR WILLIAM THOMPSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR YOLANDA THOMPSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; AUTHORIZATION FORM INDICATING PERSON DOING BUSNESS ON BEHALF OF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less