This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 10/08/2020 at 15:50:16 (UTC).

SILVER CHIROPRACTIC & WELLNESS A/A/O MANUEL DE CASTRO VS GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 SILVER CHIROPRACTIC WELLNESS A/A/O MANUEL DE CASTRO filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ECKLEY-MOULDER, KELLY E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ECKLEY-MOULDER, KELLY E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SILVER CHIROPRACTIC & WELLNESS A/A/O MANUEL DE CASTRO

1619 Nw 136Th Ave Suite 2C

Sunrise, FL 33323

Defendant

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Po Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32314

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gudin, Gregory Edward

1619 Nw 136Th Ave Ste 2C

Sunrise, FL 33323-2856

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

9/25/2020- D6- SUMMONS ISSUED GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

9/24/2020- D3- COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY - PLAINTIFF

9/24/2020- D2- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY - PLAINTIFF

COVER SHEET CIVIL - PLAINTIFF

9/24/2020- D1- COVER SHEET CIVIL - PLAINTIFF

CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3722789

9/25/2020- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3722789

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS; Assessed : $55.00; Paid : $55.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3722789

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $0 - $100

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; COVER SHEET CIVIL - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less