Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 01/29/2021 at 02:29:25 (UTC).

SHERBAN SPINE INSTITUTE, P.A. A/A/O MARIE L. FILOMENO VS PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/19/2020 SHERBAN SPINE INSTITUTE, P A A/A/O MARIE L FILOMENO filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FLOYD, MOSE L.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FLOYD, MOSE L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHERBAN SPINE INSTITUTE, P.A. A/A/O MARIE L. FILOMENO

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Saben, Adam B

10245 Centurion Pkwy N Ste 109

Jacksonville, FL 32256-0569

Defendant Attorney

Love-Lane, Rhamen Malique

390 N Orange Ave Ste 2100

Orlando, FL 32801-1642

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PLAINTIFF

5/1/2020- D16- NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PLAINTIFF

ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

4/27/2020- D12- ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE (AGREED) AND WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

3/31/2020- D11- ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE (AGREED) AND WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

STIPULATION (JOINT) WAIVING PRE-TRIAL - BOTH PARTIES

3/30/2020- D10- STIPULATION (JOINT) WAIVING PRE-TRIAL - BOTH PARTIES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL RHAMEN LOVE-LANE FOR PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

3/27/2020- D9- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL RHAMEN LOVE-LANE FOR PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

SUMMONS ISSUED PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

2/21/2020- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY) - PLAINTIFF

2/19/2020- D3- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY) - PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

2/19/2020- D2- COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

COVER SHEET - PLAINTIFF

2/19/2020- D1- COVER SHEET - PLAINTIFF

CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3619230

2/21/2020- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3619230

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379;Cancelled: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketEntered: 5/4/2020; > CANCEL REASON - DISMISSAL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketEntered: 5/4/2020; CANCELLED NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ON 6/26/2020 9:00:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/4/2020; NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 06/26/2020 9:00 AM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; > CANCEL REASON - RESCHEDULING DUE TO COVID-19 OR BK19179 PG1359

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; CANCELLED NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ON 4/2/2020 1:30:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379;Cancelled: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/6/2020; ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE (AGREED) AND WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/27/2020; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL RHAMEN LOVE-LANE FOR PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS; Assessed : $55.00; Paid : $55.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 04/02/2020 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3619230

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2020; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $0 - $100

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2020; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY) - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2020; COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2020; COVER SHEET - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SHERBAN SPINE INSTITUTE, P.A. A/A/O CARLA HORNE is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Love-Lane, Rhamen M