This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 08/02/2020 at 16:34:21 (UTC).

S2 RESIDENTIAL FOR MIRAMAR APTS VS KELSEY COBB

Case Summary

On 02/19/2020 S2 RESIDENTIAL FOR MIRAMAR APTS filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against KELSEY COBB. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SADLER, KIMBERLY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SADLER, KIMBERLY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

S2 RESIDENTIAL FOR MIRAMAR APTS

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Defendant

KELSEY COBB

Jacksonville, FL 32277

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Westling, Dale Gregory

331 Union St E Ste 2A

Jacksonville, FL 32202-2795

 

Court Documents

DEFAULT AGAINST KELSEY COBB

3/4/2020- D10- DEFAULT AGAINST KELSEY COBB

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 02/22/20, @11:46AM, TO KELSEY COBB, POSTED

3/3/2020- D9- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 02/22/20, @11:46AM, TO KELSEY COBB, POSTED

MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT/WRIT OF POSS/MIL AFF/PROOF OF CLAIM AND MOTION FOR DEFAULT -FILED BY PLTF

3/3/2020- D8- MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT/WRIT OF POSS/MIL AFF/PROOF OF CLAIM AND MOTION FOR DEFAULT -FILED BY PLTF

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS ENTERED UPON KELSEY COBB

2/21/2020- D7- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS ENTERED UPON KELSEY COBB

COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

2/19/2020- D4- COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

SUMMONS ISSUED KELSEY COBB

2/19/2020- D3- SUMMONS ISSUED KELSEY COBB

COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF'S (CIVIL)

2/19/2020- D1- COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF'S (CIVIL)

CASE FEES PAID: $198.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3618642

2/21/2020- D6- CASE FEES PAID: $198.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3618642

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR KELSEY COBB

2/19/2020- D2- CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR KELSEY COBB

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/5/2020; FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION BOOK 19133 PAGE 1020-1020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/4/2020; DEFAULT AGAINST KELSEY COBB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/4/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 02/22/20, @11:46AM, TO KELSEY COBB, POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/4/2020; MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT/WRIT OF POSS/MIL AFF/PROOF OF CLAIM AND MOTION FOR DEFAULT -FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/REMOVAL OF TENANT ACTION; Assessed : $185.00; Paid : $185.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Assessed : $3.50; Paid : $3.50; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2020; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS ENTERED UPON KELSEY COBB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $198.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3618642

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2020; EVICTION/DISTRESS FOR RENT - OR REMOVAL OF TENANT (NON-MONETARY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2020; COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED KELSEY COBB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2020; CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR KELSEY COBB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2020; COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF'S (CIVIL)

    Read MoreRead Less