This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 08/11/2020 at 17:04:40 (UTC).

RIVER CITY MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, INC VS PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 RIVER CITY MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, INC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HUDSON, DAWN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HUDSON, DAWN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RIVER CITY MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, INC

1619 Nw 136Th Ave Suite 2C

Sunrise, FL 33323

RIVER CITY MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, INC A/A/O KHENAI ALSTON

1619 Nw 136Th Ave Suite 2C

Sunrise, FL 33323

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Po Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32314

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gudin, Gregory Edward

1619 Nw 136Th Ave Ste 2C

Sunrise, FL 33323-2856

Defendant Attorney

Rensch, Scott Michael

390 N Orange Ave Ste 2100

Orlando, FL 32801-1642

 

Court Documents

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT'S) PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL, REGARDING PIP DEDUCTIBLE ELECTION

7/9/2020- D27- RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT'S) PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL, REGARDING PIP DEDUCTIBLE ELECTION

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (SUPPLEMENTAL) REGARDING PIP DEDUCTIBLE ELECTION- PLAINTIFF

6/9/2020- D26- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (SUPPLEMENTAL) REGARDING PIP DEDUCTIBLE ELECTION- PLAINTIFF

MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO HAVE REPLY DEEMED TIMELY FILED- PLAINTIFF

6/9/2020- D25- MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO HAVE REPLY DEEMED TIMELY FILED- PLAINTIFF

PRIVILEGE LOG - DEFENDANT

5/4/2020- D24- PRIVILEGE LOG - DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF FILING UNVERIFIED RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES- DEFENDANT

5/4/2020- D23- NOTICE OF FILING UNVERIFIED RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES- DEFENDANT

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE - DEFENDANT

5/4/2020- D22- RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE - DEFENDANT

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFENDANT'S) PLAINTIFF'S

4/22/2020- D17- RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFENDANT'S) PLAINTIFF'S

ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (DEFENDANT'S)

4/22/2020- D16- ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (DEFENDANT'S)

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFF'S)

4/3/2020- D14- REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFF'S)

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES -PLAINTIFF, TO DEFENDANT

4/3/2020- D12- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES -PLAINTIFF, TO DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS ELECTRONIC DELIVERY TO DONNA MOCH FOR PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

4/2/2020- D10- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS ELECTRONIC DELIVERY TO DONNA MOCH FOR PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL SCOTT RENSCH FOR PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY - DEFENDANT

3/10/2020- D9- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL SCOTT RENSCH FOR PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY - DEFENDANT

SUMMONS ISSUED - PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY A/A/O KHENAI ALSTON

2/25/2020- D8- SUMMONS ISSUED - PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY A/A/O KHENAI ALSTON

SUMMONS ISSUED - PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

2/19/2020- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED - PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3616786

2/19/2020- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3616786

COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

2/14/2020- D3- COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY - PLAINTIFF

2/14/2020- D2- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY - PLAINTIFF

COVER SHEET - (CIVIL) - PLAINTIFF

2/14/2020- D1- COVER SHEET - (CIVIL) - PLAINTIFF

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/9/2020; RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT'S) PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL, REGARDING PIP DEDUCTIBLE ELECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/10/2020; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (SUPPLEMENTAL) REGARDING PIP DEDUCTIBLE ELECTION- PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/10/2020; MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO HAVE REPLY DEEMED TIMELY FILED- PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/6/2020; PRIVILEGE LOG - DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/6/2020; NOTICE OF FILING UNVERIFIED RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES- DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/6/2020; RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE - DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 06/26/2020 9:00 AM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; > CANCEL REASON - RESCHEDULING DUE TO COVID-19 OR BK19179 PG1359

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; CANCELLED NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ON 4/2/2020 1:30:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/11/2020; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL SCOTT RENSCH FOR PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY - DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED - PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY A/A/O KHENAI ALSTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS; Assessed : $55.00; Paid : $55.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/19/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 04/02/2020 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/19/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3616786

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/19/2020; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $0 - $100

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/19/2020; COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/19/2020; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/19/2020; COVER SHEET - (CIVIL) - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less