This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 01/29/2021 at 03:37:54 (UTC).

RIVER CITY MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, INC A/A/O TORRELL BENNETT VS STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/22/2020 RIVER CITY MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, INC A/A/O TORRELL BENNETT filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FLOYD, MOSE L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FLOYD, MOSE L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RIVER CITY MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, INC A/A/O TORRELL BENNETT

1619 Nw 136Th Ave Suite 2C

Sunrise, FL 33323

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Po Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32314

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gudin, Gregory Edward

1619 Nw 136Th Ave Ste 2C

Sunrise, FL 33323-2856

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

5/11/2020- D13- NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

4/27/2020- D9- ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS ELECTRONIC DELIVERY 03/03/2020 TO LYNETTE COLEMAN FOR STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

3/20/2020- D8- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS ELECTRONIC DELIVERY 03/03/2020 TO LYNETTE COLEMAN FOR STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

SUMMONS ISSUED STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

2/24/2020- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY PLAINTIFF

2/22/2020- D3- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT PLAINTIFF

2/22/2020- D2- COMPLAINT PLAINTIFF

COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF

2/22/2020- D1- COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF

CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3620740

2/20/2020- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3620740

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379;Cancelled: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketEntered: 5/12/2020; > CANCEL REASON - NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketEntered: 5/12/2020; CANCELLED NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ON 7/9/2020 1:30:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/12/2020; NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 07/09/2020 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; > CANCEL REASON - RESCHEDULING DUE TO COVID-19 OR BK19179 PG1359

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; CANCELLED NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ON 4/9/2020 1:30:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379;Cancelled: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/20/2020; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS ELECTRONIC DELIVERY 03/03/2020 TO LYNETTE COLEMAN FOR STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS >$2500 <=$15,000 1/1/2020; Assessed : $300.00; Paid : $300.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/24/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/24/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 04/09/2020 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/24/2020; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $2,501 - $5,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/24/2020; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/24/2020; COMPLAINT PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/24/2020; COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/24/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3620740

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where River City Medical Associates Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gudin, Gregory E, ESQ.