This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 01/29/2021 at 02:48:06 (UTC).

RIVER CITY MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, INC A/A/O ARIANNA PALMER VS PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/19/2020 RIVER CITY MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, INC A/A/O ARIANNA PALMER filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MITCHELL, SCOTT F.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MITCHELL, SCOTT F.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RIVER CITY MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, INC A/A/O ARIANNA PALMER

1619 Nw 136Th Ave Suite 2C

Sunrise, FL 33323

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Po Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32314

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gudin, Gregory Edward

1619 Nw 136Th Ave Ste 2C

Sunrise, FL 33323-2856

Defendant Attorney

Colbert, Tiffany Vanessa

390 N Orange Ave Ste 2100

Orlando, FL 32801-1642

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF FILING SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR DISPOSITION, FROM PLAINTIFF

1/18/2021- D65- NOTICE OF FILING SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR DISPOSITION, FROM PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF COUNSEL TIFFANY COLBERT FOR PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY OF RECORD

9/9/2020- D62- NOTICE OF CHANGE OF COUNSEL TIFFANY COLBERT FOR PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY OF RECORD

NOTICE OF FILING COURT ORDER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, PLAINTIFF

6/29/2020- D60- NOTICE OF FILING COURT ORDER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, PLAINTIFF

MOTION TO COMPEL BETTER RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES REGARDING RELATEDNESS AND MEDICAL NECESSITY, PLAINTIFF

6/29/2020- D57- MOTION TO COMPEL BETTER RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES REGARDING RELATEDNESS AND MEDICAL NECESSITY, PLAINTIFF

MOTION TO COMPEL BETTER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE REGARDING UNDERWRITING, PLAINTIFF

6/29/2020- D55- MOTION TO COMPEL BETTER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE REGARDING UNDERWRITING, PLAINTIFF

STIPULATION (JOINT) WAIVING PRE-TRIAL- PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT

6/23/2020- D50- STIPULATION (JOINT) WAIVING PRE-TRIAL- PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF FILING COURT ORDER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR DISPOSITION, PLAINTIFF

6/17/2020- D45- NOTICE OF FILING COURT ORDER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR DISPOSITION, PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF FILING COURT ORDER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, PLAINTIFF

6/17/2020- D43- NOTICE OF FILING COURT ORDER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (DEFENDANT'S) RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S EXPERT WITNESS

5/18/2020- D37- NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (DEFENDANT'S) RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S EXPERT WITNESS

NOTICE OF FILING (DEFENDANT'S) UNVERIFIED RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

5/1/2020- D32- NOTICE OF FILING (DEFENDANT'S) UNVERIFIED RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL (TO DEFENDANT)

4/17/2020- D21- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL (TO DEFENDANT)

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES EXPERT WITNESS-PLAINTIFF'S

4/17/2020- D20- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES EXPERT WITNESS-PLAINTIFF'S

REQUEST TO PRODUCE REGARDING RELATEDNESS AND MEDICAL NECESSITY-SUPPLEMENTAL

4/17/2020- D19- REQUEST TO PRODUCE REGARDING RELATEDNESS AND MEDICAL NECESSITY-SUPPLEMENTAL

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFENDANT'S) PLAINTIFF'S FIRST

4/15/2020- D16- RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFENDANT'S) PLAINTIFF'S FIRST

STIPULATION (JOINT) WAIVING PRE-TRIAL - BOTH PARTIES

4/1/2020- D14- STIPULATION (JOINT) WAIVING PRE-TRIAL - BOTH PARTIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFF'S)

4/1/2020- D12- REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFF'S)

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S)

4/1/2020- D11- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL KELLY BEATTIE FOR PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY -DEFENDANT

3/20/2020- D8- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL KELLY BEATTIE FOR PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY -DEFENDANT

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/21/2021; NOTICE OF FILING SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR DISPOSITION, FROM PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/21/2021; NOTICE OF FILING SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR DISPOSITION, FROM PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/20/2021; NOTICE OF FILING CASE LAW IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR DISPOSITION- PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/10/2020; NOTICE OF CHANGE OF COUNSEL TIFFANY COLBERT FOR PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/30/2020; NOTICE OF FILING COURT ORDER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/30/2020; NOTICE OF FILING COURT ORDER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/30/2020; NOTICE OF FILING COURT ORDER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUUDGMENT, PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/30/2020; MOTION TO COMPEL BETTER RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES REGARDING UNDERWRITING AND POLICY FORMS, PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/30/2020; MOTION TO COMPEL BETTER RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES REGARDING RELATEDNESS AND MEDICAL NECESSITY, PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/30/2020; MOTION TO COMPEL BETTER RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES, PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
49 More Docket Entries
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/20/2020; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL KELLY BEATTIE FOR PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY -DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS; Assessed : $55.00; Paid : $55.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 04/02/2020 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3619016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2020; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $0 - $100

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2020; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY) - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2020; COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2020; COVER SHEET - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where River City Medical Associates Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gudin, Gregory E, ESQ.