This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 01/28/2021 at 23:54:28 (UTC).

REPUBLIC SERVICES OF FLORIDA, LIMITED PARTNERSHIP VS CANTRELL CONSTRUCTION, INC., AN ACTIVE FLORIDA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 REPUBLIC SERVICES OF FLORIDA, LIMITED PARTNERSHIP filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CANTRELL CONSTRUCTION, INC , AN ACTIVE FLORIDA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ARIAS, ROBERTO A.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ARIAS, ROBERTO A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REPUBLIC SERVICES OF FLORIDA, LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

301 West Bay Street Suite 1410

Jacksonville, FL 32202-5184

Defendant

CANTRELL CONSTRUCTION, INC., AN ACTIVE FLORIDA CORPORATION

1015 Atlantic Boulevard, Suite 409

Atlantic Beach, FL 32233

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Blanton, Curtis Hugh Jr

301 W Bay St Ste 1410

Jacksonville, FL 32202-5139

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION FOR INSTALLMENT SETTLEMENT AND ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND DISMISSAL

12/10/2020- D17- STIPULATION FOR INSTALLMENT SETTLEMENT AND ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND DISMISSAL

OUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE -NO AGREEMENT

12/9/2020- D16- OUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE -NO AGREEMENT

NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE MEDIATION SCHEDULED FOR 11/24/2020 10:00AM

10/27/2020- D14- NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE MEDIATION SCHEDULED FOR 11/24/2020 10:00AM

ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

4/27/2020- D13- ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

3/18/2020- D12- ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 02/26/2020 @ 11:55AM CORPORATION TO DAVID J EDWARDS FOR CANTRELL CONSTRUCTION, INC.

3/2/2020- D8- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 02/26/2020 @ 11:55AM CORPORATION TO DAVID J EDWARDS FOR CANTRELL CONSTRUCTION, INC.

SUMMONS ISSUED - CANTRELL CONSTURCTION INC, AN ACTIVE FLORIDA CORPORATION

2/14/2020- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED - CANTRELL CONSTURCTION INC, AN ACTIVE FLORIDA CORPORATION

CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3615284

2/14/2020- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3615284

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED - CANTRELL CONSTRUCTION - PLTF

2/13/2020- D3- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED - CANTRELL CONSTRUCTION - PLTF

COMPLAINT - PLTF

2/13/2020- D2- COMPLAINT - PLTF

COVER SHEET - PLTF

2/13/2020- D1- COVER SHEET - PLTF

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/14/2020; STIPULATION FOR INSTALLMENT SETTLEMENT AND ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/10/2020; OUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE -NO AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketEntered: 10/29/2020; 11/24/2020 10:00 AM -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/29/2020; NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE MEDIATION SCHEDULED FOR 11/24/2020 10:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379;Cancelled: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2020; ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 05/05/2020 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2020; > CANCEL REASON - RESCHEDULING FOR PUBLICS SAFETY DUE TO COVID-19 VIRUS - OR BK19140 PG2388

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/4/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 02/26/2020 @ 11:55AM CORPORATION TO DAVID J EDWARDS FOR CANTRELL CONSTRUCTION, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS >$2500 <=$15,000 1/1/2020; Assessed : $300.00; Paid : $300.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED - CANTRELL CONSTURCTION INC, AN ACTIVE FLORIDA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 03/26/2020 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3615284

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $2,501 - $5,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED - CANTRELL CONSTRUCTION - PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; COMPLAINT - PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; COVER SHEET - PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CANTRELL CONSTRUCTION, INC., A FLORIDA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Republic Services of Florida L P is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Blanton, Curtis Hugh Jr