Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 02/25/2021 at 00:18:00 (UTC).

REBECCA YOUNG VS SHAWN YOUNG

Case Summary

On 03/19/2020 REBECCA YOUNG filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SHAWN YOUNG. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BASS, SUZANNE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BASS, SUZANNE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

REBECCA YOUNG

Jacksonville, FL 32209

Respondent

SHAWN YOUNG

Jacksonville, FL 32209

 

Court Documents

MAGISTRATE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION

10/21/2020- D28- MAGISTRATE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION

NOTICE OF HEARING BEFORE GENERAL MASTER 10/19/2020 AT 10AM VIA ZOOM

9/17/2020- D27- NOTICE OF HEARING BEFORE GENERAL MASTER 10/19/2020 AT 10AM VIA ZOOM

ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE - M. DIANNE MISIAK

9/17/2020- D26- ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE - M. DIANNE MISIAK

MOTION TO SET ASIDE ORDER AND REQUEST A NEW HEARING/ REBECCA YOUNG

8/13/2020- D25- MOTION TO SET ASIDE ORDER AND REQUEST A NEW HEARING/ REBECCA YOUNG

MAGISTRATE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION

7/31/2020- D24- MAGISTRATE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION

NOTICE OF HEARING BEFORE GENERAL MASTER 017/13/2020 AT 10AM VIA ZOOM

6/19/2020- D23- NOTICE OF HEARING BEFORE GENERAL MASTER 017/13/2020 AT 10AM VIA ZOOM

ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE - M. DIANNE MISIAK

6/19/2020- D22- ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE - M. DIANNE MISIAK

NOTICE OF FIRST REVIEW

4/9/2020- D18- NOTICE OF FIRST REVIEW

STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

3/19/2020- D17- STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

DISCLOSURE FROM NON-LAWYER /THERESA RICHARDSON

3/19/2020- D15- DISCLOSURE FROM NON-LAWYER /THERESA RICHARDSON

CASE FEES PAID: $12.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3640283

3/19/2020- D3- CASE FEES PAID: $12.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3640283

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketEntered: 11/17/2020; FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE BOOK 19459 PAGE 1234-1235

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/22/2020; MAGISTRATE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/21/2020; NOTICE OF HEARING BEFORE GENERAL MASTER 10/19/2020 AT 10AM VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/21/2020; ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE - M. DIANNE MISIAK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/14/2020; MOTION TO SET ASIDE ORDER AND REQUEST A NEW HEARING/ REBECCA YOUNG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/3/2020; MAGISTRATE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/19/2020; NOTICE OF HEARING BEFORE GENERAL MASTER 07/13/2020 AT 10AM VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/19/2020; ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE - M. DIANNE MISIAK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketEntered: 5/26/2020; NOTICE OF SECOND REVIEW TO REBECCA YOUNG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketEntered: 5/11/2020; NOTICE OF REVIEW TO SHAWN YOUNG

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/19/2020; NOTICE OF RELATED CASES -NONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/19/2020; CERTIFICATE OF INDIGENCY /RECECCA YOUNG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/19/2020; APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS /RECECCA YOUNG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/19/2020; FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT /RECECCA YOUNG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/19/2020; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/19/2020; COMPLAINT/PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH NO DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILD(REN) OR PROPERTY/RECECCA YOUNG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/19/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED /SHAWN YOUNG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/19/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $12.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3640283

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/19/2020; POSTAL CHGS/FAM SVCS/$12 12.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/19/2020; DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less