This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 10/08/2020 at 15:42:55 (UTC).

PRAGLE CHIROPRACTIC AND MASSAGE, LLC A/A/O RANDALL CROSBY VS ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 PRAGLE CHIROPRACTIC AND MASSAGE, LLC A/A/O RANDALL CROSBY filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FLOWER, GARY P.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FLOWER, GARY P.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PRAGLE CHIROPRACTIC AND MASSAGE, LLC A/A/O RANDALL CROSBY

10245 Centurion Parkway N 305

Jacksonville, FL 32256

Defendant

ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY

200 E.Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Saben, Adam B

10245 Centurion Pkwy N Ste 109

Jacksonville, FL 32256-0569

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY

9/25/2020- D6- SUMMONS ISSUED ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY - PLAINTIFF

9/24/2020- D3- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY - PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

9/24/2020- D2- COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

COVER SHEET CIVIL - PLAINTIFF

9/24/2020- D1- COVER SHEET CIVIL - PLAINTIFF

CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3722845

9/25/2020- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3722845

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS; Assessed : $55.00; Paid : $55.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3722845

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $0 - $100

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; COVER SHEET CIVIL - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less