This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 08/13/2020 at 00:03:13 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS SARAH E GRIMM

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against SARAH E GRIMM. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FLOYD, MOSE L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FLOYD, MOSE L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

806 Douglas Road South Tower Suite 200

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Defendant

SARAH E GRIMM

Jacksonville, FL 32225

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rosen, Joseph F

Attorney at Pollack & Rosen PA

806 S Douglas Rd Ste 200

Coral Gables, FL 33134-2082

 

Court Documents

ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

4/27/2020- D15- ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

3/18/2020- D14- ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

RETURN OF NON-SERVICE SUMMONS FOR SARAH E. GRIMM REGARDING 3/19/20 @ 1:30 P.M. HEARING

2/18/2020- D10- RETURN OF NON-SERVICE SUMMONS FOR SARAH E. GRIMM REGARDING 3/19/20 @ 1:30 P.M. HEARING

SUMMONS ISSUED SARAH E GRIMM

2/4/2020- D9- SUMMONS ISSUED SARAH E GRIMM

CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3607671

1/31/2020- D7- CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3607671

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING - PLAINTIFF

1/31/2020- D4- NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING - PLAINTIFF

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379;Cancelled: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 06/12/2020 9:00 AM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; > CANCEL REASON - RESCHEDULING DUE TO COVID-19 OR BK19179 PG1359

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; CANCELLED NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ON 4/28/2020 1:30:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379;Cancelled: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2020; ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 04/28/2020 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2020; > CANCEL REASON - RESCHEDULING FOR PUBLICS SAFETY DUE TO COVID-19 VIRUS - OR BK19140 PG2359

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED SARAH E GRIMM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 03/19/2020 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3607671

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2020; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $501 - $2,500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2020; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (SARAH E GRIMM) - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2020; NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2020; NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2020; STATEMENT OF CLAIM - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2020; COVER SHEET - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less