This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 10/08/2020 at 15:44:46 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS PHYLLIS WILSON

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against PHYLLIS WILSON. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FLOYD, MOSE L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FLOYD, MOSE L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

120 Corporate Blvd.

Norfolk, VA 23502

Defendant

PHYLLIS WILSON

Jacksonville, FL 32244-8103

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

White, Racquel Ann

Attorney at Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC

Po Box 1341

Windermere, FL 34786-1341

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED PHYLLIS WILSON

9/24/2020- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED PHYLLIS WILSON

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

9/24/2020- D4- NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR PHYLLIS WILSON - PLAINTIFF

9/24/2020- D3- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR PHYLLIS WILSON - PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

9/24/2020- D2- COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

COVER SHEET CIVIL - PLAINTIFF

9/24/2020- D1- COVER SHEET CIVIL - PLAINTIFF

CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3722581

9/22/2020- D6- CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3722581

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS>$500/=; Assessed : $175.00; Paid : $175.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/24/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED PHYLLIS WILSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/24/2020; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $501 - $2,500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/24/2020; NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/24/2020; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR PHYLLIS WILSON - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/24/2020; COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/24/2020; COVER SHEET CIVIL - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/24/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3722581

    Read MoreRead Less