This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 02/06/2020 at 15:34:50 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS NOEL NAZARIO

Case Summary

On 01/23/2020 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against NOEL NAZARIO. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BATEH, MICHAEL I. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BATEH, MICHAEL I

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

7765 Sw 87Th Ave Ste 101

Miami, FL 33173

Defendant

NOEL NAZARIO

Jacksonville, FL 32277-2854

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dragutsky, Jason Scott

Attorney at Hayt Hayt & Landau, PL

7765 Sw 87Th Ave Ste 101

Miami, FL 33173-2535

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED NOEL NAZARIO

1/24/2020- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED NOEL NAZARIO

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED NOEL NAZARIO, PLAINTIFF'S

1/23/2020- D3- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED NOEL NAZARIO, PLAINTIFF'S

COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF'S

1/23/2020- D1- COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF'S

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES, PLAINTIFF'S

1/23/2020- D2- COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES, PLAINTIFF'S

CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3601301

1/22/2020- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3601301

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS>$500/=; Assessed : $175.00; Paid : $175.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/24/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED NOEL NAZARIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketEntered: 1/24/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 03/05/2020 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketEntered: 1/24/2020; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $501 - $2,500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/24/2020; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED NOEL NAZARIO, PLAINTIFF'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/24/2020; COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/24/2020; COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES, PLAINTIFF'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/24/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3601301

    Read MoreRead Less