This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 04/05/2020 at 10:52:25 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS MICHAEL SILVESTRE

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against MICHAEL SILVESTRE. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SALEM, R ANTHONY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SALEM, R ANTHONY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

806 Douglas Road South Tower Suite 200

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Defendant

MICHAEL SILVESTRE

Jacksonville, FL 32223

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rosen, Joseph F

Attorney at Pollack & Rosen PA

806 S Douglas Rd Ste 200

Coral Gables, FL 33134-2082

 

Court Documents

ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

3/18/2020- D14- ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE (PERSONAL) ON MICHAEL SILVESTRE 2/6/2020 @ 4:03 PM

2/8/2020- D10- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE (PERSONAL) ON MICHAEL SILVESTRE 2/6/2020 @ 4:03 PM

SUMMONS ISSUED MICHAEL SILVESTER

2/3/2020- D9- SUMMONS ISSUED MICHAEL SILVESTER

CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3607015

2/3/2020- D7- CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3607015

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR MICHAEL SILVESTER - PLAINTIFF

1/31/2020- D5- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR MICHAEL SILVESTER - PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING - PLAINTIFF

1/31/2020- D4- NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING - PLAINTIFF

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS - PLAINTIFF

1/31/2020- D3- DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS - PLAINTIFF

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - PLAINTIFF

1/31/2020- D2- STATEMENT OF CLAIM - PLAINTIFF

COVER SHEET CIVIL - PLAINTIFF

1/31/2020- D1- COVER SHEET CIVIL - PLAINTIFF

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 2:15 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (PRO SE) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379;Cancelled: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2020; ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 04/28/2020 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2020; > CANCEL REASON - RESCHEDULING FOR PUBLICS SAFETY DUE TO COVID-19 VIRUS - OR BK19140 PG2359

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2020; CANCELLED NOTICE TO APPEAR (PRO SE) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ON 3/19/2020 2:15:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/10/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE (PERSONAL) ON MICHAEL SILVESTRE 2/6/2020 @ 4:03 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS>$500/=; Assessed : $175.00; Paid : $175.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/3/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED MICHAEL SILVESTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/3/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (PRO SE) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 03/19/2020 2:15 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/3/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3607015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/3/2020; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $501 - $2,500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/3/2020; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR MICHAEL SILVESTER - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/3/2020; NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/3/2020; DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/3/2020; STATEMENT OF CLAIM - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/3/2020; COVER SHEET CIVIL - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less