This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 02/03/2021 at 17:29:56 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC VS JOHN WILSON

Case Summary

On 10/26/2020 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JOHN WILSON. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FERGUSON, III, EMMET F.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FERGUSON, III, EMMET F.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

120 Corporate Blvd.

Norfolk, VA 23502

Defendant

JOHN WILSON

Jacksonville, FL 32205

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

White, Racquel Ann

Attorney at Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC

120 Corporate Blvd

Norfolk, VA 23502-4952

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 11/03/2020 01:51PM PERSONAL, JOHN WILSON

11/9/2020- D8- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 11/03/2020 01:51PM PERSONAL, JOHN WILSON

SUMMONS ISSUED JOHN WILSON

10/27/2020- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED JOHN WILSON

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING - PLAINTIFF

10/26/2020- D4- NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING - PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR JOHN WILSON - PLAINTIFF

10/26/2020- D3- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR JOHN WILSON - PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

10/26/2020- D2- COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

COVER SHEET CIVIL - PLAINTIFF

10/26/2020- D1- COVER SHEET CIVIL - PLAINTIFF

CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3743350

10/27/2020- D6- CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3743350

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/9/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 11/03/2020 01:51PM PERSONAL, JOHN WILSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS>$500/=; Assessed : $175.00; Paid : $175.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/27/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED JOHN WILSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/27/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3743350

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketEntered: 10/27/2020; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $501 - $2,500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/27/2020; NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/27/2020; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR JOHN WILSON - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/27/2020; COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/27/2020; COVER SHEET CIVIL - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WHITE, RACQUEL ANN