This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 08/13/2020 at 00:08:14 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC VS JOHN ANDUJAR

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against JOHN ANDUJAR. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PERRY, ERIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PERRY, ERIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

Po Box 23200

Louisville, KY 40223

Defendant

JOHN ANDUJAR

Jacksonville, FL 32244-5147

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Teal, Brooke Elizabeth

Po Box 23200

Louisville, KY 40223-0200

 

Court Documents

ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

4/27/2020- D13- ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

3/18/2020- D12- ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE TO JOHN ANDUJAR ON 02/11/20 @8:26PM, SUBSERVICE ON JOHN DOE

2/12/2020- D8- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE TO JOHN ANDUJAR ON 02/11/20 @8:26PM, SUBSERVICE ON JOHN DOE

SUMMONS ISSUED JOHN ANDUJAR

2/3/2020- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED JOHN ANDUJAR

CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3607500

1/31/2020- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3607500

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (JOHN ANDUJAR) - PLAINTIFF

1/31/2020- D3- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (JOHN ANDUJAR) - PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

1/31/2020- D2- COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

COVER SHEET - PLAINTIFF

1/31/2020- D1- COVER SHEET - PLAINTIFF

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379;Cancelled: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 06/12/2020 9:00 AM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; > CANCEL REASON - RESCHEDULING DUE TO COVID-19 OR BK19179 PG1359

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; CANCELLED NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ON 4/28/2020 1:30:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379;Cancelled: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2020; ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 04/28/2020 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2020; > CANCEL REASON - RESCHEDULING FOR PUBLICS SAFETY DUE TO COVID-19 VIRUS - OR BK19140 PG2359

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/13/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE TO JOHN ANDUJAR ON 02/11/20 @8:26PM, SUBSERVICE ON JOHN DOE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS>$500/=; Assessed : $175.00; Paid : $175.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/3/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED JOHN ANDUJAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/3/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 03/19/2020 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/3/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3607500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/3/2020; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $501 - $2,500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/3/2020; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (JOHN ANDUJAR) - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/3/2020; COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/3/2020; COVER SHEET - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less