Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 01/28/2021 at 17:31:23 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS IOLA SIMS

Case Summary

On 01/27/2020 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against IOLA SIMS. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SADLER, KIMBERLY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SADLER, KIMBERLY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

806 Douglas Road, South Tower, Suite 200

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Defendant

IOLA SIMS

Jacksonville, FL 32218

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rosen, Joseph F

Attorney at Pollack & Rosen PA

806 S Douglas Rd Ste 200

Coral Gables, FL 33134-2082

Defendant Attorney

Wells, Marilyn Gantt

2064 Park St

Jacksonville, FL 32204-3810

 

Court Documents

SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATUS REPORT - DENY

3/12/2020- D16- SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATUS REPORT - DENY

PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER AND NOTICE OF TRIAL - HEARING TO BE SET

3/12/2020- D15- PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER AND NOTICE OF TRIAL - HEARING TO BE SET

STIPULATION (JOINT) FOR CANCELLATION OR WAIVER OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - BOTH PARTIES

3/12/2020- D12- STIPULATION (JOINT) FOR CANCELLATION OR WAIVER OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - BOTH PARTIES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL MARILYN WELLS FOR IOLA SIMS DEFENDANT AND NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK PREVAILING PARTY ATTORNEY FEES AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATED EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE

3/2/2020- D11- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL MARILYN WELLS FOR IOLA SIMS DEFENDANT AND NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK PREVAILING PARTY ATTORNEY FEES AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATED EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE TO IOLA SIMS ON 02/06/20 @8:02PM

2/11/2020- D10- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE TO IOLA SIMS ON 02/06/20 @8:02PM

SUMMONS ISSUED IOLA SIMS

1/28/2020- D9- SUMMONS ISSUED IOLA SIMS

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - PLAINTIFF

1/27/2020- D5- STATEMENT OF CLAIM - PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR IOLA SIMS - PLAINTIFF

1/27/2020- D4- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR IOLA SIMS - PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING - PLAINTIFF

1/27/2020- D3- NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING - PLAINTIFF

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS - PLAINTIFF

1/27/2020- D2- DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS - PLAINTIFF

COVER SHEET CIVIL - PLAINTIFF

1/27/2020- D1- COVER SHEET CIVIL - PLAINTIFF

CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3602893

1/26/2020- D7- CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3602893

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379;Cancelled: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/17/2020; SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATUS REPORT - DENY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/12/2020; PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER AND NOTICE OF TRIAL - HEARING TO BE SET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/12/2020; > CANCEL REASON - STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/12/2020; CANCELLED NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ON 3/12/2020 1:30:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/12/2020; STIPULATION (JOINT) FOR CANCELLATION OR WAIVER OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - BOTH PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/3/2020; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL MARILYN WELLS FOR IOLA SIMS DEFENDANT AND NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK PREVAILING PARTY ATTORNEY FEES AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATED EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/13/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE TO IOLA SIMS ON 02/06/20 @8:02PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS>$500/=; Assessed : $175.00; Paid : $175.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED IOLA SIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 03/12/2020 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $501 - $2,500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; STATEMENT OF CLAIM - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR IOLA SIMS - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; COVER SHEET CIVIL - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3602893

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSEN , JOSEPH F