This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 01/28/2021 at 17:26:12 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS HELENE SEYMOUR

Case Summary

On 01/27/2020 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HELENE SEYMOUR. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HIGBEE, RONALD P.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HIGBEE, RONALD P.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

806 Douglas Road, South Tower, Suite 200

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Defendant

HELENE SEYMOUR

Jacksonville, FL 32217

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rosen, Joseph F

Attorney at Pollack & Rosen PA

806 S Douglas Rd Ste 200

Coral Gables, FL 33134-2082

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBITS(S)- PLAINTIFF

4/24/2020- D15- NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBITS(S)- PLAINTIFF

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT FOR HELENE SEYMOUR- PLAINTIFF

4/24/2020- D14- NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT FOR HELENE SEYMOUR- PLAINTIFF

AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS - PLAINTIFF

4/24/2020- D13- AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS - PLAINTIFF

SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATUS REPORT - DEFENDANT FAILED TO APPEAR

3/12/2020- D11- SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATUS REPORT - DEFENDANT FAILED TO APPEAR

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE TO HELENE SEYMOUR ON 02/13/20 @4:10PM, SUBSERVICE ON SHANE SEYMOUR

2/18/2020- D10- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE TO HELENE SEYMOUR ON 02/13/20 @4:10PM, SUBSERVICE ON SHANE SEYMOUR

SUMMONS ISSUED HELENE SEYMOUR

1/28/2020- D9- SUMMONS ISSUED HELENE SEYMOUR

CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3603031

1/28/2020- D7- CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3603031

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED HELENE SEYMOUR, PLAINITFF'S

1/27/2020- D4- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED HELENE SEYMOUR, PLAINITFF'S

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING FROM PLAINTIFF

1/27/2020- D3- NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING FROM PLAINTIFF

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS FROM PLAINTIFF

1/27/2020- D2- DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS FROM PLAINTIFF

COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF'S

1/27/2020- D1- COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF'S

STATEMENT OF CLAIM PLAINTIFF'S

1/27/2020- D5- STATEMENT OF CLAIM PLAINTIFF'S

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketEntered: 5/26/2020; FINAL JUDGMENT (DEFAULT) BOOK 19219 PAGE 1062-1062

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBITS(S)- PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT FOR HELENE SEYMOUR- PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/17/2020; DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST HELENE SEYMOUR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/17/2020; SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATUS REPORT - DEFENDANT FAILED TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/20/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE TO HELENE SEYMOUR ON 02/13/20 @4:10PM, SUBSERVICE ON SHANE SEYMOUR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS>$500/=; Assessed : $175.00; Paid : $175.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED HELENE SEYMOUR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 03/12/2020 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3603031

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $501 - $2,500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED HELENE SEYMOUR, PLAINITFF'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING FROM PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS FROM PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; STATEMENT OF CLAIM PLAINTIFF'S

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSEN , JOSEPH F