Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 01/28/2021 at 17:33:51 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS FRAYSA PAEZ

Case Summary

On 01/27/2020 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FRAYSA PAEZ. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PERRY, ERIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PERRY, ERIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

806 Douglas Road, South Tower, Suite 200

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Defendant

FRAYSA PAEZ

Jacksonville, FL 32221

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rosen, Joseph F

Attorney at Pollack & Rosen PA

806 S Douglas Rd Ste 200

Coral Gables, FL 33134-2082

 

Court Documents

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT FOR FRAYSA PAEZ- PLAINTIFF

4/24/2020- D15- NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT FOR FRAYSA PAEZ- PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBIT(S)- PLAINTIFF

4/24/2020- D14- NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBIT(S)- PLAINTIFF

AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS - PLAINTIFF

4/24/2020- D13- AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS - PLAINTIFF

SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATUS REPORT - DEFENDANT FAILED TO APPEAR

3/12/2020- D11- SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATUS REPORT - DEFENDANT FAILED TO APPEAR

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE INDIVIDUAL ON 2-5-2020 AT 9:58 AM TO FRAYSA PAEZ

2/12/2020- D10- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE INDIVIDUAL ON 2-5-2020 AT 9:58 AM TO FRAYSA PAEZ

SUMMONS ISSUED FRAYSA PAEZ

1/28/2020- D9- SUMMONS ISSUED FRAYSA PAEZ

STATEMENT OF CLAIM :PLAINTIFF

1/27/2020- D5- STATEMENT OF CLAIM :PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR FRAYSA PAEZ :PLAINTIFF

1/27/2020- D4- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR FRAYSA PAEZ :PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING :PLAINTIFF

1/27/2020- D3- NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING :PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS :PLAINTIFF

1/27/2020- D2- NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS :PLAINTIFF

COVER SHEET :PLAINTIFF

1/27/2020- D1- COVER SHEET :PLAINTIFF

CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3603442

1/28/2020- D7- CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3603442

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT FOR FRAYSA PAEZ- PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBIT(S)- PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/17/2020; DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST FRAYSA PAEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/17/2020; SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATUS REPORT - DEFENDANT FAILED TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE INDIVIDUAL ON 2-5-2020 AT 9:58 AM TO FRAYSA PAEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS>$500/=; Assessed : $175.00; Paid : $175.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED FRAYSA PAEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 03/12/2020 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3603442

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $501 - $2,500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; STATEMENT OF CLAIM :PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR FRAYSA PAEZ :PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING :PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS :PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; COVER SHEET :PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSEN , JOSEPH F