This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 01/28/2021 at 17:24:26 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS ALEXANDRA HARGROVE

Case Summary

On 01/27/2020 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ALEXANDRA HARGROVE. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FLOWER, GARY P.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FLOWER, GARY P.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

806 Douglas Road, South Tower, Suite 200

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Defendant

ALEXANDRA HARGROVE

Jacksonville, FL 32246

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rosen, Joseph F

Attorney at Pollack & Rosen PA

806 S Douglas Rd Ste 200

Coral Gables, FL 33134-2082

 

Court Documents

SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATUS REPORT - ADMIT

3/12/2020- D11- SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATUS REPORT - ADMIT

RETURN OF NON-SERVICE ON SUMMONS FOR ALEXANDRA HARGROVE 2/14/20 @ 12:20PM

2/24/2020- D10- RETURN OF NON-SERVICE ON SUMMONS FOR ALEXANDRA HARGROVE 2/14/20 @ 12:20PM

SUMMONS ISSUED ALEXANDRA HARGROVE

1/28/2020- D9- SUMMONS ISSUED ALEXANDRA HARGROVE

COMPLAINT/STATEMENT OF CLAIM/PETITION

1/27/2020- D5- COMPLAINT/STATEMENT OF CLAIM/PETITION

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

1/27/2020- D4- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

1/27/2020- D3- NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

1/27/2020- D2- DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

COVER SHEET

1/27/2020- D1- COVER SHEET

CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3602908

1/26/2020- D7- CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3602908

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/17/2020; SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATUS REPORT - ADMIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2020; RETURN OF NON-SERVICE ON SUMMONS FOR ALEXANDRA HARGROVE 2/14/20 @ 12:20PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS >$2500 <=$15,000 1/1/2020; Assessed : $300.00; Paid : $300.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED ALEXANDRA HARGROVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 03/12/2020 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $2,501 - $5,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; STATEMENT OF CLAIM - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (ALEXANDRA HARGROVE) - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; COVER SHEET - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3602908

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSEN , JOSEPH F