This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 09/21/2021 at 10:02:02 (UTC).

POR FAV PROPERTY SERVICES, LLC VS CHERYL A COBB Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/30/2020 POR FAV PROPERTY SERVICES, LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against CHERYL A COBB. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NORTON, VIRGINIA B.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NORTON, VIRGINIA B.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

POR FAV PROPERTY SERVICES, LLC

114 S. Fremont Avenue

Tampa, FL 33606

Defendants

REBECCA C NEWELL

Jacksonville, FL 32223

ELIZABETH L COBB

Jacksonville, FL 32224

STACI A COBB

Jacksonville, FL 32256

CHERYL A COBB

Jacksonville, FL 32223

DAVID L COBB III

Jacksonville, FL 32225

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fernandez, Kristopher Emil

114 S Fremont Ave

Tampa, FL 33606-1703

 

Court Documents

DEFAULT AGAINST DEFTS DAVID COBB III, STACI COBB, REBECCA NEWELL, ELIZABETH COBB AND CHERYL COBB

9/8/2020- D18- DEFAULT AGAINST DEFTS DAVID COBB III, STACI COBB, REBECCA NEWELL, ELIZABETH COBB AND CHERYL COBB

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST DEFTS DAVID COBB III, STACI COBB, REBECCA NEWELL, ELIZABETH COBB AND CHERYL COBB CONTEMPT/ENFORCEMENT

9/8/2020- D17- MOTION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST DEFTS DAVID COBB III, STACI COBB, REBECCA NEWELL, ELIZABETH COBB AND CHERYL COBB CONTEMPT/ENFORCEMENT

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE - CHERYL COBB - 08/13/20 7:15PM - SUBST SERV: ELIZABETH COBB

9/8/2020- D16- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE - CHERYL COBB - 08/13/20 7:15PM - SUBST SERV: ELIZABETH COBB

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE - ELIZABETH COBB - 08/13/20 7:15PM

9/8/2020- D15- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE - ELIZABETH COBB - 08/13/20 7:15PM

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE - REBECCA NEWELL - 08/14/20 3:40PM

9/8/2020- D14- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE - REBECCA NEWELL - 08/14/20 3:40PM

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE - STACI COBB - 08/13/20 12:25PM

9/8/2020- D13- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE - STACI COBB - 08/13/20 12:25PM

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE - DAVID COBB III - 08/13/20 5:20PM - SUBST SERV: STEPHANIE COBB

9/8/2020- D12- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE - DAVID COBB III - 08/13/20 5:20PM - SUBST SERV: STEPHANIE COBB

COMPLAINT ( VERIFIED ) TO QUIET TITLE TO REAL PROPERTY UNDER SECTION 65.081, FLORIDA STATUTES

7/30/2020- D7- COMPLAINT ( VERIFIED ) TO QUIET TITLE TO REAL PROPERTY UNDER SECTION 65.081, FLORIDA STATUTES

CASE FEES PAID: $451.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3693516

7/30/2020- D11- CASE FEES PAID: $451.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3693516

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

7/30/2020- D9- VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

7/30/2020- D8- NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketEntered: 12/4/2020; FINAL JUDGMENT OF QUIET TITLE BOOK 19482 PAGE 457-458

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketEntered: 10/6/2020; NOTICE OF HEARING - 10/19/20 11:50AM - VIA TELEPHONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/8/2020; MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE AFTER DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/8/2020; DEFAULT AGAINST DEFTS DAVID COBB III, STACI COBB, REBECCA NEWELL, ELIZABETH COBB AND CHERYL COBB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/8/2020; MOTION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST DEFTS DAVID COBB III, STACI COBB, REBECCA NEWELL, ELIZABETH COBB AND CHERYL COBB CONTEMPT/ENFORCEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/8/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE - CHERYL COBB - 08/13/20 7:15PM - SUBST SERV: ELIZABETH COBB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/8/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE - ELIZABETH COBB - 08/13/20 7:15PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/8/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE - REBECCA NEWELL - 08/14/20 3:40PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/8/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE - STACI COBB - 08/13/20 12:25PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/8/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE - DAVID COBB III - 08/13/20 5:20PM - SUBST SERV: STEPHANIE COBB

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketEntered: 7/31/2020; OTHER REAL PROPERTY ACTIONS $0 - $50,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/31/2020; VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/31/2020; NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 19338 PAGE 1590-1590

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/31/2020; COMPLAINT ( VERIFIED ) TO QUIET TITLE TO REAL PROPERTY UNDER SECTION 65.081, FLORIDA STATUTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketEntered: 7/31/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED TO: CHERYL A. COBB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketEntered: 7/31/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED TO: ELIZABETH L. COBB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketEntered: 7/31/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED TO: REBECCA C. NEWELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketEntered: 7/31/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED TO: STACI R. COBB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketEntered: 7/31/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED TO: DAVID L. COBB, III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketEntered: 7/31/2020; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FERNANDEZ KRISTOPHER E