This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 01/29/2021 at 04:09:22 (UTC).

PINNACLE LIVING FOR TOWNSEND APTS VS CHARLENA JOHNSON Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/24/2020 PINNACLE LIVING FOR TOWNSEND APTS filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against CHARLENA JOHNSON. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FLOWER, GARY P.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FLOWER, GARY P.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PINNACLE LIVING FOR TOWNSEND APTS

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Defendants

CHARLENA JOHNSON

Jacksonville, FL 32277

PAMELA MUCKER

Jacksonville, FL 32277

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Westling, Dale Gregory

331 Union St E Ste 2A

Jacksonville, FL 32202-2795

 

Court Documents

NOTICE TO THE PARTIES

9/4/2020- D21- NOTICE TO THE PARTIES

MEMO TO DISBURSE FUNDS OF $1,950.00 TO: TOWNSEND APTS. C/O DALE G. WESTLING, SR. ESQ. 331 EAST UNION STREET JACKSONVILLE, FL 32202 (BAL 0.00)

8/27/2020- D19- MEMO TO DISBURSE FUNDS OF $1,950.00 TO: TOWNSEND APTS. C/O DALE G. WESTLING, SR. ESQ. 331 EAST UNION STREET JACKSONVILLE, FL 32202 (BAL 0.00)

NOTICE TO COURT FILED BY PLAINTIFF

5/8/2020- D17- NOTICE TO COURT FILED BY PLAINTIFF

ORDER TEMPORARILY STAYING EVICTIONS FOR NON PAYMENT AND REQUIRING FURTHER PLEADING FROM PLAINTIFF

5/6/2020- D16- ORDER TEMPORARILY STAYING EVICTIONS FOR NON PAYMENT AND REQUIRING FURTHER PLEADING FROM PLAINTIFF

MEMORANDUM TO CASHIER RENT FOR FEB. AND MARCH 2020 $1950.00 CL. $36.75

3/4/2020- D13- MEMORANDUM TO CASHIER RENT FOR FEB. AND MARCH 2020 $1950.00 CL. $36.75

CASE FEES PAID: $1,986.75 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3629998

3/4/2020- D12- CASE FEES PAID: $1,986.75 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3629998

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS DEFENDANT PAMELA MUCKER

2/24/2020- D9- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS DEFENDANT PAMELA MUCKER

CASE FEES PAID: $212.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3622302

2/24/2020- D8- CASE FEES PAID: $212.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3622302

COVER SHEET

2/24/2020- D1- COVER SHEET

NOTICE TO THE PARTIES

10/7/2020- D22- NOTICE TO THE PARTIES

ORDER DIRECTING DISBURSEMENT OF REGISTRY DEPOSIT

8/26/2020- D18- ORDER DIRECTING DISBURSEMENT OF REGISTRY DEPOSIT

MOTION FOR DISBURSEMENT OF REGISTRY FUNDS - FILED BY PLAINTIFF

5/4/2020- D15- MOTION FOR DISBURSEMENT OF REGISTRY FUNDS - FILED BY PLAINTIFF

ORDER FOR DEPOSIT AMOUNT OF $1,950.00, ON 05/04/20, BY 12:00(NOON) AND ORDER SETTING HEARING

3/27/2020- D14- ORDER FOR DEPOSIT AMOUNT OF $1,950.00, ON 05/04/20, BY 12:00(NOON) AND ORDER SETTING HEARING

ANSWER SUBMITTED BY THE DEFENDANT PAMELA MUCKER AND CHARLENA JOHNSON

3/4/2020- D11- ANSWER SUBMITTED BY THE DEFENDANT PAMELA MUCKER AND CHARLENA JOHNSON

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS DEFENDANT CHARLENA JOHNSON

2/24/2020- D10- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS DEFENDANT CHARLENA JOHNSON

COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

2/24/2020- D6- COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

SUMMONS ISSUED DEFENDANT CHARLENA JOHNSON

2/24/2020- D5- SUMMONS ISSUED DEFENDANT CHARLENA JOHNSON

SUMMONS ISSUED DEFENDANT PAMELA MUCKER

2/24/2020- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED DEFENDANT PAMELA MUCKER

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/8/2020; NOTICE TO THE PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/4/2020; NOTICE TO THE PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/4/2020; FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION, CLERK SHALL ISSUE WRIT OF POSSESSON 9-14-2020 BOOK 19358 PAGE 2177-2177

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/27/2020; MEMO TO DISBURSE FUNDS OF $1,950.00 TO: TOWNSEND APTS. C/O DALE G. WESTLING, SR. ESQ. 331 EAST UNION STREET JACKSONVILLE, FL 32202 (BAL 0.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/26/2020; ORDER DIRECTING DISBURSEMENT OF REGISTRY DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/11/2020; NOTICE TO COURT FILED BY PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/8/2020; ORDER TEMPORARILY STAYING EVICTIONS FOR NON PAYMENT AND REQUIRING FURTHER PLEADING FROM PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/4/2020; MOTION FOR DISBURSEMENT OF REGISTRY FUNDS - FILED BY PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/31/2020; ORDER FOR DEPOSIT AMOUNT OF $1,950.00, ON 05/04/20, BY 12:00(NOON) AND ORDER SETTING HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/REGISTRY/GENCIV; Assessed : $1,986.75; Paid : $1,986.75; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/26/2020; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS DEFENDANT CHARLENA JOHNSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/26/2020; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS DEFENDANT PAMELA MUCKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/26/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $212.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3622302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/26/2020; EVICTION/DISTRESS FOR RENT - OR REMOVAL OF TENANT (NON-MONETARY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/26/2020; COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/26/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED DEFENDANT CHARLENA JOHNSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/26/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED DEFENDANT PAMELA MUCKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/26/2020; CERTIFICATE OF MAILING DEFENDANT CHARLENA JOHNSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/26/2020; CERTIFICATE OF MAILING DEFENDANT PAMELA MUCKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/26/2020; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DALE G WESTLING, SR