Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 01/28/2021 at 23:16:51 (UTC).

PFINI LLC VS OSCAR HARDIN

Case Summary

On 02/11/2020 PFINI LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against OSCAR HARDIN. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ECKLEY-MOULDER, KELLY E and FLOWER, GARY P.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ECKLEY-MOULDER, KELLY E

FLOWER, GARY P.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PFINI LLC

13457 N Main St

Jacksonville, FL 32218

Defendant

OSCAR HARDIN

Jacksonville, FL 32210

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED ON 3/9/2020 @ 9:57 AM TO SHAWN BAKER

3/10/2020- D19- WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED ON 3/9/2020 @ 9:57 AM TO SHAWN BAKER

CASE FEES PAID: $7.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3628616

3/3/2020- D18- CASE FEES PAID: $7.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3628616

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

3/3/2020- D17- WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION BOOK 19123 PAGE 1170-1170

2/27/2020- D15- FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION BOOK 19123 PAGE 1170-1170

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT (DEFAULT) AS TO OSCAR HARDIN

2/25/2020- D13- MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT (DEFAULT) AS TO OSCAR HARDIN

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT AS TO OSCAR HARDIN

2/25/2020- D14- NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT AS TO OSCAR HARDIN

DEFAULT (JUDICAL) AGAINST OSCAR HARDEN

2/20/2020- D12- DEFAULT (JUDICAL) AGAINST OSCAR HARDEN

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 02/18/20, @9:30AM, TO OSCAR HARDIN, INDIVIDUAL

2/20/2020- D11- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 02/18/20, @9:30AM, TO OSCAR HARDIN, INDIVIDUAL

ANSWER SUBMIT BY DEFENDANT OSCAR HARDIN

2/18/2020- D8- ANSWER SUBMIT BY DEFENDANT OSCAR HARDIN

MEMORANDUM TO CASHIER RENT FOR DEC. 2019 $400.00 CL. $12.00

2/18/2020- D10- MEMORANDUM TO CASHIER RENT FOR DEC. 2019 $400.00 CL. $12.00

CASE FEES PAID: $412.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3615862

2/18/2020- D9- CASE FEES PAID: $412.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3615862

CASE FEES PAID: $195.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3612840

2/11/2020- D7- CASE FEES PAID: $195.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3612840

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS ENTERED ON OSCAR HARDIN

2/11/2020- D6- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS ENTERED ON OSCAR HARDIN

SUMMONS ISSUED OSCAR HARDING

2/11/2020- D5- SUMMONS ISSUED OSCAR HARDING

COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

2/11/2020- D4- COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF'S (CIVIL)

2/11/2020- D2- COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF'S (CIVIL)

AUTHORIZATION FORM INDICATING PERSON FOR SHAWN BAKER(PROPERTY MANAGER) DOING BUSNESS ON BEHALF OF

2/11/2020- D3- AUTHORIZATION FORM INDICATING PERSON FOR SHAWN BAKER(PROPERTY MANAGER) DOING BUSNESS ON BEHALF OF

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/25/2020; WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED ON 3/9/2020 @ 9:57 AM TO SHAWN BAKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : WRIT OF POSSESSION; Assessed : $7.00; Paid : $7.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/3/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $7.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3628616

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/3/2020; WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/28/2020; FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION BOOK 19123 PAGE 1170-1170

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2020; MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT (DEFAULT) AS TO OSCAR HARDIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2020; NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT AS TO OSCAR HARDIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2020; DEFAULT (JUDICAL) AGAINST OSCAR HARDEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 02/18/20, @9:30AM, TO OSCAR HARDIN, INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/REGISTRY/GENCIV; Assessed : $412.00; Paid : $412.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/18/2020; ANSWER SUBMIT BY DEFENDANT OSCAR HARDIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/REMOVAL OF TENANT ACTION; Assessed : $185.00; Paid : $185.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/11/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $195.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3612840

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/11/2020; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS ENTERED ON OSCAR HARDIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/11/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED OSCAR HARDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/11/2020; COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/11/2020; COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF'S (CIVIL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/11/2020; EVICTION/DISTRESS FOR RENT - OR REMOVAL OF TENANT (NON-MONETARY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/11/2020; AUTHORIZATION FORM INDICATING PERSON FOR SHAWN BAKER(PROPERTY MANAGER) DOING BUSNESS ON BEHALF OF PFINI LLC (PLAINTIFF)

    Read MoreRead Less