This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 05/03/2021 at 16:38:30 (UTC).

PETRONELLA MALONEY VS SOUTHERN BAPTIST HOSPITAL OF FL INC DBA BAPTIST

Case Summary

On 08/04/2020 PETRONELLA MALONEY filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against SOUTHERN BAPTIST HOSPITAL OF FL INC DBA BAPTIST. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NORTON, VIRGINIA B.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NORTON, VIRGINIA B.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PETRONELLA MALONEY

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Defendant

SOUTHERN BAPTIST HOSPITAL OF FL INC DBA BAPTIST

800 Prudential Drive

Jacksonville, HI 32202

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Chakour, Fadi

233 E Bay St

Jacksonville, FL 32202-3452

Defendant Attorneys

Ramsey, Richard Edward

Wicker Smith Et Al Bank Of America Bldg 50 N Laura St Ste 2700

Jacksonville, FL 32202-3675

Paveglio, Steven Denis Jr

Attorney at Wicker Smith O'Hara McCoy & Ford P.A.

50 N Laura St Ste 2700

Jacksonville, FL 32202-3675

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

8/4/2020- D2- COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/29/2021; RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTFS) TO DEFT SECOND/ TO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/29/2021; NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (PLTFS) UNVERIFIED/ TO DEFTS SECOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/13/2021; NOTICE OF POSTPONEMENT OF HEARING ON 4-27-21 @ 2 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/6/2021; NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (VIDEOTAPED) PETRONELLA MALONEY ON JUNE 15, 2021 @ 10:00 A.M. VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/2/2021; NOTICE OF ZOOM HEARING SCHEDULED FOR: 4/27/2021 @ 02:00 P.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketEntered: 3/30/2021; REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF (DEFENDANT'S SECOND)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketEntered: 3/30/2021; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF (DEFENDANT'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketEntered: 3/30/2021; MOTION TO DISMISS (DEFT.'S) PLTF.'S AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH CHAPTER 766 AND INCORPORATED MOTION FOR SANCTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketEntered: 3/26/2021; NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT --DEFT AND ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketEntered: 3/22/2021; AMENDED COMPLAINT -FIRST

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 08/12/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketEntered: 8/12/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3698846

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketEntered: 8/12/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED TO SOUTHERN BAPTIST HOSPITAL OF FLORIDA, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CIR/GENERALCIVIL 7/1/2019; Assessed : $401.00; Paid : $401.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketEntered: 8/7/2020; PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF CONTINGENCY FEE AGREEMENT - PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketEntered: 8/5/2020; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketEntered: 8/5/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $401.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3695157

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketEntered: 8/5/2020; MALPRACTICE -MEDICAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/5/2020; COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketEntered: 8/5/2020; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHERN BAPTIST HOSPITAL OF FLORIDA, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Chakour, Fadi