Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 01/29/2021 at 02:54:35 (UTC).

PERZHEEN ABDULSALAM GUNDKY VS DETRON LAMAR PARKS

Case Summary

On 03/12/2020 PERZHEEN ABDULSALAM GUNDKY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DETRON LAMAR PARKS. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COOPER, WCOLLINS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COOPER, WCOLLINS

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PERZHEEN ABDULSALAM GUNDKY

Jacksonville, FL 32216

Respondent

DETRON LAMAR PARKS

Jacksonville, FL 32216

Not Classified By Court

Mediator

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Weldon, Ian Thomas

334 E Duval St

Jacksonville, FL 32202-2724

Respondent Attorney

Anum, Obinna Prince

300 W Adams St Ste 440

Jacksonville, FL 32202-4342

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Fulton, Holly E

Attorney at Head Moss Fulton & Griffin PA

1530 Business Center Dr Ste 4

Fleming Island, FL 32003-9027

 

Court Documents

FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE (CONSENT) BOOK 19447 PAGE 1741-1764

11/9/2020- D25- FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE (CONSENT) BOOK 19447 PAGE 1741-1764

NOTICE OF HEARING /DETRON LAMAR PARKS/ATTY, 8/27/2020 @ 9:30 A.M.

7/27/2020- D22- NOTICE OF HEARING /DETRON LAMAR PARKS/ATTY, 8/27/2020 @ 9:30 A.M.

CFID-CERTIFICATE /DETRON PARKS

6/30/2020- D20- CFID-CERTIFICATE /DETRON PARKS

FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT /DETRON LAMAR PARKS

5/27/2020- D15- FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT /DETRON LAMAR PARKS

FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT PERZHEEN ABDULSALAM GUNDKY

5/14/2020- D14- FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT PERZHEEN ABDULSALAM GUNDKY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL OBINNA ANUM FOR DETRON PARKS

4/7/2020- D9- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL OBINNA ANUM FOR DETRON PARKS

COMPLAINT/PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND OTHER RELIEF/PERZHEEN ABDULSALAM GUNDKY/ATTY

3/12/2020- D2- COMPLAINT/PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND OTHER RELIEF/PERZHEEN ABDULSALAM GUNDKY/ATTY

CASE FEES PAID: $419.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3638085

3/16/2020- D7- CASE FEES PAID: $419.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3638085

STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

3/12/2020- D5- STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketEntered: 11/10/2020; ATTY. FOR RESPONDENT: ANUM, OBINNA PRINCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketEntered: 11/10/2020; ATTY. FOR PETITIONER: WELDON, IAN THOMAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/10/2020; FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE (CONSENT) BOOK 19447 PAGE 1741-1764

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketEntered: 11/6/2020; NOTICE OF HEARING (AMENDED) 11/09/2020 9:30 AM VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketEntered: 11/6/2020; NOTICE OF HEARING 08/27/2020 9:30 AM VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/27/2020; NOTICE OF HEARING /DETRON LAMAR PARKS/ATTY, 8/27/2020 @ 9:30 A.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketEntered: 7/1/2020; DISPOSITION OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE /AGREEMENT SIGNED-TOTAL RESOLUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/1/2020; CFID-CERTIFICATE /DETRON PARKS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketEntered: 6/24/2020; ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION (HOLLY E. FULTON)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketEntered: 6/3/2020; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS MEDIATOR/HOLLY E FULTON, ESQ.

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/21/2020; RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS DETRON LAMAR PARKS SERVED 03/17/2020 9:50 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CIR/DISSOLUTION MARRIAGE 7/1/2019; Assessed : $409.00; Paid : $409.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/16/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $419.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3638085

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/16/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED DETRON LAMAR PARKS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/16/2020; NOTICE OF RELATED CASES -NONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/16/2020; STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/16/2020; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/16/2020; COMPLAINT/PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND OTHER RELIEF/PERZHEEN ABDULSALAM GUNDKY/ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/16/2020; DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mediator is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fulton, Holly E