This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 05/01/2021 at 00:43:33 (UTC).

PAULA WILLIAMS AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF PAULESHA JANELL GIBSON, DECEASED VS ORANGE PARK MEDICAL CENTER

Case Summary

On 10/30/2020 PAULA WILLIAMS AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF PAULESHA JANELL GIBSON, DECEASED filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against ORANGE PARK MEDICAL CENTER. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WALLACE, III, WADDELL A.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WALLACE, III, WADDELL A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PAULA WILLIAMS AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF PAULESHA JANELL GIBSON, DECEASED

Stuart, FL 34995

Defendant

ORANGE PARK MEDICAL CENTER

2001 Kingsley Avenue

Orange Park, FL 32073

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Norbraten, Todd Martin

Po Box 395

Stuart, FL 34995-0395

Defendant Attorneys

Worley, Jenifer Strickland

245 Riverside Ave Ste 400

Jacksonville, FL 32202-4926

Williams, Lauren Byrns

1200 Riverplace Blvd Ste 201

Jacksonville, FL 32207-1899

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ORANGE PARK MEDICAL CENTER

10/30/2020- D2- SUMMONS ISSUED TO ORANGE PARK MEDICAL CENTER

COMPLAINT

11/2/2020- D3- COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/15/2021; NOTICE OF HEARING ON THURSDAY, APRIL 29, 2021 @ 11:15 A.M. VIA ZOOM BEFORE HONORABLE WADDELLA. WALLACE, III (15 MINS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2021; NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE --DEFT'S ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketEntered: 2/23/2021; RESPONSE TO DEFT'S MOTION TO DISMISS BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketEntered: 1/25/2021; NOTICE OF HEARING ON MARCH 3 2021 @ 02:00 PM VIA ZOOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketEntered: 1/5/2021; RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFT'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketEntered: 1/5/2021; NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (DEFT'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketEntered: 12/9/2020; MOTION TO DISMISS --DEFT ORANGE PARK MEDICAL CENTER'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketEntered: 12/7/2020; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT, ORANGE PARK MEDICAL CENTER'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketEntered: 12/7/2020; NOTICE OF FILING --TO DEFT,ORANGE PARK MEDICAL CENTER'S FIRST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 11/25/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON ORANGE PARK MEDICAL CENTER 11/18/2020 @ 230PM BY DONNA MOCH

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketEntered: 11/17/2020; REQUEST TO PRODUCE DIRECTED TO DEFT ORANGE PARK MEDICAL CENTER INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketEntered: 11/17/2020; NOTICE OF FILING OF PLTF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT ORANGE PARK MEDICAL CENTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CIR/GENERALCIVIL 7/1/2019; Assessed : $401.00; Paid : $401.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/2/2020; COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketEntered: 11/2/2020; MALPRACTICE -MEDICAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/2/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED TO ORANGE PARK MEDICAL CENTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketEntered: 11/2/2020; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketEntered: 11/2/2020; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketEntered: 11/2/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3747429

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Orange Park Medical Center, Inc. Dba Orange Park Medical Center is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NORBRATEN, TODD MARTIN