This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 08/05/2020 at 14:47:43 (UTC).

PATRICIA KING VS ADVANCE COMMERCIAL PEST SERVICES, INC.

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 PATRICIA KING filed an Other lawsuit against ADVANCE COMMERCIAL PEST SERVICES, INC. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WILKINSON, GARY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WILKINSON, GARY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PATRICIA KING

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Defendant

ADVANCE COMMERCIAL PEST SERVICES, INC.

271 Rialto Drive

Ponte Vedra, FL 32081

Not Classified By Court

Mediator

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Moody, Jeffrey Mitchell

76 S Laura St Ste 1100

Jacksonville, FL 32202-5413

Defendant Attorney

Ruff, Mark Howard

630 N Wymore Rd Ste 330

Maitland, FL 32751-4254

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Lucas, Brett Quincy

Attorney at Brett Q Lucas PA

6272 Dupont Station Ct E

Jacksonville, FL 32217-2567

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL MARK RUFF FOR ADVANCE COMMERCIAL PEST SERVICES, INC.

3/6/2020- D8- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL MARK RUFF FOR ADVANCE COMMERCIAL PEST SERVICES, INC.

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON ADVANCE COMMERCIAL PEST SERVICES INC 02/28/2020 @135PM BY MARIS BARRY

3/4/2020- D7- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON ADVANCE COMMERCIAL PEST SERVICES INC 02/28/2020 @135PM BY MARIS BARRY

COMPLAINT

1/31/2020- D2- COMPLAINT

CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3605677

1/30/2020- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3605677

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2021
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : JURY TRIAL; Location : NO COURT ROOM ENTERED; Courtroom : 0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketEntered: 7/24/2020; NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY (AMENDED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketEntered: 7/24/2020; CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION AND HIPAA STATEMENT OF SARISFACTORY ASSURANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketEntered: 7/23/2020; NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY -DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketEntered: 6/26/2020; RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketEntered: 6/26/2020; NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT PLTF TO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 6/25/2020; NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (PLTFS) UNVERIFIED/ TO DEFTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketEntered: 6/23/2020; NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES (DEFT ADVANCE COMMERCIAL PEST SERVICE INC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketEntered: 6/22/2020; NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH PLTFS REQUEST FOR COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketEntered: 6/18/2020; REQUEST FOR COPIES (PLTF.)

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/10/2020; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL MARK RUFF FOR ADVANCE COMMERCIAL PEST SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/4/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON ADVANCE COMMERCIAL PEST SERVICES INC 02/28/2020 @135PM BY MARIS BARRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CIR/GENERALCIVIL 7/1/2019; Assessed : $401.00; Paid : $401.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketEntered: 1/31/2020; OTHER NEGLIGENCE-PREMISES LIABILITY-COMMERCIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketEntered: 1/31/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED TO ADVANCE COMMERCIAL PEST SERVICES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/31/2020; COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketEntered: 1/31/2020; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketEntered: 1/31/2020; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/31/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3605677

    Read MoreRead Less