This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 10/09/2020 at 15:43:51 (UTC).

ORO CROSS CREEK LLC FOR CROSS CREEK APTS VS DEANGELO R ALEXANDER

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 ORO CROSS CREEK LLC FOR CROSS CREEK APTS filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against DEANGELO R ALEXANDER. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LANIGAN, ROBIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LANIGAN, ROBIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ORO CROSS CREEK LLC FOR CROSS CREEK APTS

C/O Dale G. Westling, Sr., Esquire 331 E Union St

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Defendant

DEANGELO R ALEXANDER

Jacksonville, FL 32210

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Westling, Dale Gregory

331 Union St E Ste 2A

Jacksonville, FL 32202-2795

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS FOR DEANGELO R. ALEXANDER

9/28/2020- D8- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS FOR DEANGELO R. ALEXANDER

UNABLE TO ISSUE CERT. OF MAILING TO BE ISSUED AT A LATER DATE FOR DEANGELO ALEXANDER

9/25/2020- D7- UNABLE TO ISSUE CERT. OF MAILING TO BE ISSUED AT A LATER DATE FOR DEANGELO ALEXANDER

COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

9/25/2020- D4- COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

SUMMONS ISSUED DEANGELO ALEXANDER

9/25/2020- D3- SUMMONS ISSUED DEANGELO ALEXANDER

COVER SHEET (CIVIL)

9/25/2020- D1- COVER SHEET (CIVIL)

CASE FEES PAID: $198.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3723266

9/25/2020- D6- CASE FEES PAID: $198.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3723266

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR DEANGELO ALEXANDER

9/25/2020- D2- CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR DEANGELO ALEXANDER

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/28/2020; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS FOR DEANGELO R. ALEXANDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/REMOVAL OF TENANT ACTION; Assessed : $185.00; Paid : $185.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Assessed : $3.50; Paid : $3.50; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; UNABLE TO ISSUE CERT. OF MAILING TO BE ISSUED AT A LATER DATE FOR DEANGELO ALEXANDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $198.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3723266

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; EVICTION/DISTRESS FOR RENT - OR REMOVAL OF TENANT (NON-MONETARY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED DEANGELO ALEXANDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR DEANGELO ALEXANDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; COVER SHEET (CIVIL)

    Read MoreRead Less