This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 10/08/2020 at 15:31:56 (UTC).

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC AS SUCCESSOR SERVICER TO, SPRINGLEAF FINANCIAL SERVICES OF AMERICA, INC. AS SERVICER VS MICHELLE M HOWARD A/K/A MICHELLE HOWARD

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC AS SUCCESSOR SERVICER TO, SPRINGLEAF FINANCIAL SERVICES OF AMERICA, INC AS SERVICER filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against MICHELLE M HOWARD A/K/A MICHELLE HOWARD. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HUDSON, DAWN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HUDSON, DAWN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC AS SUCCESSOR SERVICER TO, SPRINGLEAF FINANCIAL SERVICES OF AMERICA, INC. AS SERVICER

Defendant

MICHELLE M HOWARD A/K/A MICHELLE HOWARD

Jacksonville, FL 32217-3722

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lobello, Thomas III

233 E Bay St Ste 720

Jacksonville, FL 32202-3448

 

Court Documents

MAIL RECEIPT RETURNED DELIVERED FOR MICHELLE M HOWARD

9/30/2020- D7- MAIL RECEIPT RETURNED DELIVERED FOR MICHELLE M HOWARD

NOTICE OF TRANSFER FROM BREVARD CO TO DUVAL CO

9/24/2020- D5- NOTICE OF TRANSFER FROM BREVARD CO TO DUVAL CO

SUMMONS ISSUED MICHELLE M HOWARD A/K/A MICHELLE HOWARD, PLAINTIFF'S

9/24/2020- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED MICHELLE M HOWARD A/K/A MICHELLE HOWARD, PLAINTIFF'S

DOCKET LIST

9/24/2020- D3- DOCKET LIST

CASE TRANSFERRED TO DUVAL FROM ANOTHER COUNTY (BREVARD) 052019SC57581

9/24/2020- D2- CASE TRANSFERRED TO DUVAL FROM ANOTHER COUNTY (BREVARD) 052019SC57581

CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3722011

9/24/2020- D6- CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3722011

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/2/2020; MAIL RECEIPT RETURNED DELIVERED FOR MICHELLE M HOWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS>$500/=; Assessed : $175.00; Paid : $175.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/24/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3722011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/24/2020; NOTICE OF TRANSFER FROM BREVARD CO TO DUVAL CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/24/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED MICHELLE M HOWARD A/K/A MICHELLE HOWARD, PLAINTIFF'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/24/2020; DOCKET LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/24/2020; CASE TRANSFERRED TO DUVAL FROM ANOTHER COUNTY (BREVARD) 052019SC57581

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/24/2020; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $501 - $2,500

    Read MoreRead Less