This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 04/28/2021 at 02:24:33 (UTC).

OCEAN VIEW HEALTH CHIROPRACTIC, INC. AS ASSIGNEE OF PAUL PARSONS VS UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

Case Summary

On 10/06/2020 OCEAN VIEW HEALTH CHIROPRACTIC, INC AS ASSIGNEE OF PAUL PARSONS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DERKE, ELENI ELIA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DERKE, ELENI ELIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OCEAN VIEW HEALTH CHIROPRACTIC, INC. AS ASSIGNEE OF PAUL PARSONS

10245 Centurion Parkway N 305

Jacksonville, FL 32256

Defendant

UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

200 E.Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Saben, Adam B

10245 Centurion Pkwy N Ste 109

Jacksonville, FL 32256-0569

Defendant Attorney

Ferreiro, Nicholas A

315 E Robinson St Ste 550

Orlando, FL 32801-1631

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET CIVIL - PLAINTIFF

10/6/2020- D1- COVER SHEET CIVIL - PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

10/6/2020- D2- COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION - PLAINTIFF

10/6/2020- D3- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION - PLAINTIFF

CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3731322

10/8/2020- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3731322

SUMMONS ISSUED UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

10/8/2020- D6- SUMMONS ISSUED UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS SHUSTER & SABEN, LLC FILES

10/19/2020- D7- DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS SHUSTER & SABEN, LLC FILES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST) TO DEFENDANT

10/19/2020- D8- REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST) TO DEFENDANT

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST) TO DEFENDANT

10/19/2020- D9- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST) TO DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL NICHOLAS FERREIRO FOR UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION (DEFENDANT'S) AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

10/19/2020- D10- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL NICHOLAS FERREIRO FOR UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION (DEFENDANT'S) AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

PRETRIAL STIPULATION (JOINT) WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AND INVOKING FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURES

12/4/2020- D11- PRETRIAL STIPULATION (JOINT) WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AND INVOKING FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURES

ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE AND WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

12/4/2020- D12- ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE AND WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (DEFENDANT'S) TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

12/24/2020- D13- MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (DEFENDANT'S) TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

MOTION TO COMPEL AND FOR ATTORNEYS FEES PURSUANT TO RULE 1.380(A)(4) -PLAINTIFF

1/29/2021- D15- MOTION TO COMPEL AND FOR ATTORNEYS FEES PURSUANT TO RULE 1.380(A)(4) -PLAINTIFF

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (DEFT'S UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION)

2/1/2021- D14- ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (DEFT'S UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION)

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE PURSUANT TO FLA. STATE. 90.202(9) OF FLORIDA STATUTE 626.877 FLA.STAT 90.202(9) OF FLORIDA STATUTE 626.878 AND FLA STAT 90.202(9) OF RULE 698-220.201

4/18/2021- D16- REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE PURSUANT TO FLA. STATE. 90.202(9) OF FLORIDA STATUTE 626.877 FLA.STAT 90.202(9) OF FLORIDA STATUTE 626.878 AND FLA STAT 90.202(9) OF RULE 698-220.201

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF'S SUPPLEMENTAL) TO DEFT RE: APPLICATION OF MEDICARE PART B FEE SCHEDULE

4/18/2021- D17- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF'S SUPPLEMENTAL) TO DEFT RE: APPLICATION OF MEDICARE PART B FEE SCHEDULE

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/20/2021; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF'S SUPPLEMENTAL) TO DEFT RE: APPLICATION OF MEDICARE PART B FEE SCHEDULE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/20/2021; REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE PURSUANT TO FLA. STATE. 90.202(9) OF FLORIDA STATUTE 626.877 FLA.STAT 90.202(9) OF FLORIDA STATUTE 626.878 AND FLA STAT 90.202(9) OF RULE 698-220.201

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/1/2021; ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (DEFT'S UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/1/2021; MOTION TO COMPEL AND FOR ATTORNEYS FEES PURSUANT TO RULE 1.380(A)(4) -PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/28/2020; MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (DEFENDANT'S) TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/8/2020; ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE AND WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/7/2020; PRETRIAL STIPULATION (JOINT) WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AND INVOKING FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/22/2020; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL NICHOLAS FERREIRO FOR UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION (DEFENDANT'S) AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/20/2020; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST) TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/20/2020; REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST) TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/19/2020; DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS SHUSTER & SABEN, LLC FILES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS; Assessed : $55.00; Paid : $55.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/8/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/8/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3731322

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketEntered: 10/8/2020; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $0 - $100

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/8/2020; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/8/2020; COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/8/2020; COVER SHEET CIVIL - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OCEAN VIEW HEALTH CHIROPRACTIC INC. A/A/O NICHOLE BYERS is a litigant

Latest cases where United Services Automobile Association is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Saben, Adam B