This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 05/14/2021 at 01:06:44 (UTC).

OCEAN VIEW HEALTH CHIROPRACTIC INC. AS ASSIGNEE OF CARRIE ANNE KEANE VS ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/10/2020 OCEAN VIEW HEALTH CHIROPRACTIC INC AS ASSIGNEE OF CARRIE ANNE KEANE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HIGBEE, RONALD P.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HIGBEE, RONALD P.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OCEAN VIEW HEALTH CHIROPRACTIC INC. AS ASSIGNEE OF CARRIE ANNE KEANE

10245 Centurion Parkway N 305

Jacksonville, FL 32256

Defendant

ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

200 E.Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Saben, Adam B

10245 Centurion Pkwy N Ste 109

Jacksonville, FL 32256-0569

Winer, Melissa Rakin

10245 Centurion Pkwy N Ste 305

Jacksonville, FL 32256-0569

Defendant Attorney

Parrino, Anthony Joseph

8950 Dr Martin Luther King Jr St N Ste 220

Saint Petersburg, FL 33702-3001

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET CIVIL - PLAINTIFF

11/10/2020- D1- COVER SHEET CIVIL - PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

11/10/2020- D2- COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

11/10/2020- D3- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3753102

11/10/2020- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3753102

SUMMONS ISSUED ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

11/10/2020- D6- SUMMONS ISSUED ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ANTHONY PARRINO FOR ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

12/2/2020- D7- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ANTHONY PARRINO FOR ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS SHUSTER & SABEN, LLC FILES

12/8/2020- D8- NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS SHUSTER & SABEN, LLC FILES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST) TO DEFENDANT

12/8/2020- D9- REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST) TO DEFENDANT

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST) TO DEFENDANT

12/8/2020- D10- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST) TO DEFENDANT

MOTION TO TAX COST (PLAINTIFF'S) ATTORNEY'S FEES WITH INTEREST FOR CONFESSION OF JUDGMENT

12/9/2020- D11- MOTION TO TAX COST (PLAINTIFF'S) ATTORNEY'S FEES WITH INTEREST FOR CONFESSION OF JUDGMENT

WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE & INVOKING FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE, BOTH PARTIES

3/2/2021- D12- WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE & INVOKING FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE, BOTH PARTIES

ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE AND WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

3/3/2021- D13- ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE AND WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL) TO DEFENDANT RE: APPLICATION OF MEDICARE PART B FEE SCHEDULE

5/11/2021- D14- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL) TO DEFENDANT RE: APPLICATION OF MEDICARE PART B FEE SCHEDULE

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/12/2021; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL) TO DEFENDANT RE: APPLICATION OF MEDICARE PART B FEE SCHEDULE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/4/2021; ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE AND WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/2/2021; WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE & INVOKING FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE, BOTH PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/10/2020; MOTION TO TAX COST (PLAINTIFF'S) ATTORNEY'S FEES WITH INTEREST FOR CONFESSION OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/9/2020; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST) TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/9/2020; REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST) TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/9/2020; NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS SHUSTER & SABEN, LLC FILES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/3/2020; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ANTHONY PARRINO FOR ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS; Assessed : $55.00; Paid : $55.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/10/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/10/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3753102

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketEntered: 11/10/2020; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $0 - $100

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/10/2020; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/10/2020; COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/10/2020; COVER SHEET CIVIL - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OCEAN VIEW HEALTH CHIROPRACTIC INC. A/A/O NICHOLE BYERS is a litigant

Latest cases where Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANTHONY J PARRINO