This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 04/08/2021 at 05:11:02 (UTC).

OCEAN VIEW HEALTH CHIROPRACTIC INC. A/A/O NICHOLE BYERS VS FIRST ACCEPTANCE INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/12/2020 OCEAN VIEW HEALTH CHIROPRACTIC INC A/A/O NICHOLE BYERS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FIRST ACCEPTANCE INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SADLER, KIMBERLY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SADLER, KIMBERLY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OCEAN VIEW HEALTH CHIROPRACTIC INC. A/A/O NICHOLE BYERS

10245 Centurion Parkway N 305

Jacksonville, FL 32256

Defendant

FIRST ACCEPTANCE INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.

200 E.Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Saben, Adam B

10245 Centurion Pkwy N Ste 109

Jacksonville, FL 32256-0569

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

10/12/2020- D1- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

10/12/2020- D2- COMPLAINT

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED - FIRST ACCEPTANCE INSURANCE COMPANY, INC - PLTF

10/12/2020- D3- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED - FIRST ACCEPTANCE INSURANCE COMPANY, INC - PLTF

CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3734973

10/14/2020- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3734973

SUMMONS ISSUED - FIRST ACCEPTANCE INSURANCE COMPANY, INC

10/14/2020- D6- SUMMONS ISSUED - FIRST ACCEPTANCE INSURANCE COMPANY, INC

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL - PLAINTIFF

12/16/2020- D7- NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL - PLAINTIFF

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM : DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING - PLAINTIFF

12/16/2020- D8- FINAL DISPOSITION FORM : DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING - PLAINTIFF

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/17/2020; FINAL DISPOSITION FORM : DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/17/2020; NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS; Assessed : $55.00; Paid : $55.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/14/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED - FIRST ACCEPTANCE INSURANCE COMPANY, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/14/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3734973

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketEntered: 10/14/2020; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $0 - $100

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/14/2020; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED - FIRST ACCEPTANCE INSURANCE COMPANY, INC - PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/14/2020; COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/14/2020; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OCEAN VIEW HEALTH CHIROPRACTIC INC. A/A/O NICHOLE BYERS is a litigant

Latest cases where First Acceptance Insurance Company Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Saben, Adam B