This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 02/23/2022 at 08:51:02 (UTC).

OCEAN VIEW HEALTH CHIROPRACTIC INC. A/A/O JENNIFER SUTTON VS UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

Case Summary

On 09/14/2020 OCEAN VIEW HEALTH CHIROPRACTIC INC A/A/O JENNIFER SUTTON filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ECKLEY-MOULDER, KELLY E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ECKLEY-MOULDER, KELLY E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OCEAN VIEW HEALTH CHIROPRACTIC INC. A/A/O JENNIFER SUTTON

10245 Centurion Parkway N 305

Jacksonville, FL 32256

Defendant

UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

200 E.Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Saben, Adam B

10245 Centurion Pkwy N Ste 305

Jacksonville, FL 32256-0569

Gazecka, Julia E

10245 Centurion Pkwy N Ste 305

Jacksonville, FL 32256-0569

Defendant Attorney

Plaza Rios, Yolanda

100 S Ashley Dr Ste 13500

Tampa, FL 33602-5304

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF FILING - DEFENDANT

8/11/2021- D48- NOTICE OF FILING - DEFENDANT

MOTION TO COMPEL (DEFENDANTS) DISCOVERY RESPONSES

7/21/2021- D44- MOTION TO COMPEL (DEFENDANTS) DISCOVERY RESPONSES

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FROM PLAINTIFF

8/30/2021- D49- NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FROM PLAINTIFF

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT - DEFENDANT

8/11/2021- D46- MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT - DEFENDANT

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM FROM PLAINTIFF

8/30/2021- D50- FINAL DISPOSITION FORM FROM PLAINTIFF

ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (AGREED) PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY REQUESTS

8/5/2021- D45- ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (AGREED) PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY REQUESTS

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT JUDGMENT - DEFENDANT

8/11/2021- D47- MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT JUDGMENT - DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES RE: DEFENDANTS DEMAND LETTER AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE - PLAINTIFF

4/27/2021- D31- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES RE: DEFENDANTS DEMAND LETTER AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE - PLAINTIFF

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO RE: DEMAND LETTER AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE - DEFENDANT

5/7/2021- D39- RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO RE: DEMAND LETTER AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE - DEFENDANT

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/1/2021; FINAL DISPOSITION FORM FROM PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/1/2021; NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FROM PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/12/2021; NOTICE OF FILING - DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/12/2021; MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT JUDGMENT - DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/12/2021; MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT - DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/6/2021; ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (AGREED) PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY REQUESTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/23/2021; MOTION TO COMPEL (DEFENDANTS) DISCOVERY RESPONSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/7/2021; MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (PLAINTIFF'S) IN WHICH TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/10/2021; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT'S) TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/10/2021; RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS -DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/13/2020; NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS (DEFENDANT'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/13/2020; MOTION TO INVOKE THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE -DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS=>$100/=<$500 3/1/2012; Assessed : $80.00; Paid : $80.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/17/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/17/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $90.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3717929

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/17/2020; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $101 - $500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/17/2020; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR UNITES SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/17/2020; COMPLAINT , PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/17/2020; COVER SHEET , PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OCEAN VIEW HEALTH CHIROPRACTIC INC. A/A/O NICHOLE BYERS is a litigant

Latest cases where United Services Automobile Association is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Saben, Adam B

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gazecka, Julia E