This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 04/05/2021 at 01:14:55 (UTC).

OCEAN VIEW HEALTH CHIROPRACTIC INC. A/A/O CARRIE BAIN VS USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/30/2020 OCEAN VIEW HEALTH CHIROPRACTIC INC A/A/O CARRIE BAIN filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FERGUSON, III, EMMET F.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FERGUSON, III, EMMET F.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OCEAN VIEW HEALTH CHIROPRACTIC INC. A/A/O CARRIE BAIN

10245 Centurion Parkway N 305

Jacksonville, FL 32256

Defendant

USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

200 E.Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Saben, Adam B

10245 Centurion Pkwy N Ste 109

Jacksonville, FL 32256-0569

Defendant Attorney

Rinaman, James Curtis III

1054 Kings Ave

Jacksonville, FL 32207-8312

 

Court Documents

CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3726929

10/1/2020- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3726929

COVER SHEET - PLAINTIFF

9/30/2020- D1- COVER SHEET - PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

9/30/2020- D2- COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED - USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY - PLAINTIFF

9/30/2020- D3- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED - USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY - PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ISSUED - USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

10/1/2020- D6- SUMMONS ISSUED - USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL JAMES RINAMAN III FOR USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

1/27/2021- D7- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL JAMES RINAMAN III FOR USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

MOTION TO INVOKE (DEFT'S) THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

1/27/2021- D8- MOTION TO INVOKE (DEFT'S) THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS

1/29/2021- D9- NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST) TO DEFENDANT

1/29/2021- D10- REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST) TO DEFENDANT

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST) TO DEFENDANT

1/29/2021- D11- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST) TO DEFENDANT

OBJECTION (DEFENDANT'S) AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AS TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION, REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS AND OTHER DISCOVERY

3/1/2021- D12- OBJECTION (DEFENDANT'S) AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AS TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION, REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS AND OTHER DISCOVERY

MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT BY INTERLINEATION - PLAINTIFF

3/9/2021- D13- MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT BY INTERLINEATION - PLAINTIFF

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/11/2021; MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT BY INTERLINEATION - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/2/2021; OBJECTION (DEFENDANT'S) AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AS TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION, REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS AND OTHER DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/31/2021; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST) TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/31/2021; REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST) TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/31/2021; NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/27/2021; MOTION TO INVOKE (DEFT'S) THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/27/2021; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL JAMES RINAMAN III FOR USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS; Assessed : $55.00; Paid : $55.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/1/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED - USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/1/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3726929

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketEntered: 10/1/2020; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $0 - $100

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/1/2020; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED - USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/1/2020; COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/1/2020; COVER SHEET - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OCEAN VIEW HEALTH CHIROPRACTIC INC. A/A/O NICHOLE BYERS is a litigant

Latest cases where USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Saben, Adam B