This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 01/29/2021 at 02:40:48 (UTC).

NORTH FLORIDA ANESTHESIA CONSULTANT VS MICHAEL BALLEW

Case Summary

On 02/19/2020 NORTH FLORIDA ANESTHESIA CONSULTANT filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MICHAEL BALLEW. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RUTH, JAMES A.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RUTH, JAMES A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NORTH FLORIDA ANESTHESIA CONSULTANT

Tampa, FL 33619

Defendant

MICHAEL BALLEW

Jacksonville, FL 32216-3143

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kidd, Evan D

9210 King Palm Dr

Tampa, FL 33619-8332

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS FROM PLAINTIFF

8/18/2020- D20- AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS FROM PLAINTIFF

AFFIDAVIT IN PROOF OF CLAIM AND NON MILITARY SERVICE, FROM PLAINTIFF

8/18/2020- D19- AFFIDAVIT IN PROOF OF CLAIM AND NON MILITARY SERVICE, FROM PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF FILING FROM PLAINTIFF

8/18/2020- D18- NOTICE OF FILING FROM PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 06/29/2020 @ 10:40AM SUB SERVICE TO JANICE STONE FOR MICHAEL BALLEW

6/30/2020- D17- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 06/29/2020 @ 10:40AM SUB SERVICE TO JANICE STONE FOR MICHAEL BALLEW

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED 06/25/2020 RAN OUT OF TIME

6/25/2020- D16- SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED 06/25/2020 RAN OUT OF TIME

SUMMONS ISSUED MICHAEL BALLEW-ALIAS

6/25/2020- D15- SUMMONS ISSUED MICHAEL BALLEW-ALIAS

CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3679279

6/24/2020- D14- CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3679279

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR MICHAEL BALLEW

6/24/2020- D13- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR MICHAEL BALLEW

ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

4/27/2020- D9- ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED ON SUMMONS 03/24/2020 @ 9:45AM MICHAEL BALLEW

3/26/2020- D8- SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED ON SUMMONS 03/24/2020 @ 9:45AM MICHAEL BALLEW

SUMMONS ISSUED - MICHAEL BALLEW

2/21/2020- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED - MICHAEL BALLEW

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR MICHAEL BALLEW - PLAINTIFF

2/19/2020- D3- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR MICHAEL BALLEW - PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

2/19/2020- D2- COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

COVER SHEET - (CIVIL) - PLAINTIFF

2/19/2020- D1- COVER SHEET - (CIVIL) - PLAINTIFF

CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3618862

2/19/2020- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3618862

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/19/2020; AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS FROM PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/19/2020; AFFIDAVIT IN PROOF OF CLAIM AND NON MILITARY SERVICE, FROM PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/19/2020; NOTICE OF FILING FROM PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/30/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 06/29/2020 @ 10:40AM SUB SERVICE TO JANICE STONE FOR MICHAEL BALLEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/25/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED 06/25/2020 RAN OUT OF TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/25/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED MICHAEL BALLEW-ALIAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/25/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3679279

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/25/2020; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR MICHAEL BALLEW

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/26/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED ON SUMMONS 03/24/2020 @ 9:45AM MICHAEL BALLEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS >$2500 <=$15,000 1/1/2020; Assessed : $300.00; Paid : $300.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED - MICHAEL BALLEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 04/02/2020 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3618862

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2020; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $2,501 - $5,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2020; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR MICHAEL BALLEW - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2020; COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2020; COVER SHEET - (CIVIL) - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIDD, EVAN D